Natalie Grumet v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Natalie Grumet
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01537
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Kojima, Keiko)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on October 22, 2020. (gga)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Kojima, Keiko)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Natalie Grumet, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 7/21/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 7/22/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa)
August 19, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Life Insurance Company of North America, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Natalie Grumet. (filed in state court 6/19/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying (1) Plaintiff Natalie Grumet; and (2) Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kojima, Keiko)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Kojima, Keiko)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01148760-CU-IC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27702278 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Keiko J Kojima added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Kojima, Keiko)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natalie Grumet v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Keiko J Kojima
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Grumet
Represented By: Scott E Calvert
Represented By: Michael B Horrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?