Otillia Nicole Correa v. Zillow Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Otillia Nicole Correa
Defendant: Zillow Group, Inc., Amy Hegarty and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01684
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice #17 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1), the instant action, Nicole Otilia Correa v. Zillow Group Inc. et al. Case No. 8:20-cv-01684-JLS-(DFM), is hereby dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
October 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Otillia Nicole Correa. Dismissal is without. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pl Correa's Proposed Order Granting Voluntary Dismissal)(Cojocnean, Timothy)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Memorandum in Support of Motion #14 , for the following reasons: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event is "See Notice of Deficiency #15 ); (2) Hearing information is missing; (3) Local Rule 7.1-1 No Certification of Interested Parties and/or no copies; (4) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; (5) Counsel shall refer to Judge Staton's Procedures and Schedules page on the Court's website and choose an AVAILABLE civil motion hearing date; Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.11; Proposed Order should be filed as an attachment to the efiled Motion to Remand and a Word version of the proposed order must be emailed to Judge Staton's generic email address; Filer used the event Memorandum in Support of Motion; which does not prompt the user to set a hearing before the judge. (jp)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Motion #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Remand Case to State Court - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. (2) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (4) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (5) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1; (6) Proposed Order should be filed as an attachment to the e-filed a Motion to Remand and e-mailed to Josephine L. Staton a generic email address a WordPerfect or Microsoft Word version of the document; (6) Filer used the even Memorandum in Support of Motion; which does not prompt the user to set a hearing before the judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 10/6/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #16 ] - MEMORANDUM in Support Motion to Remand Action to State Court filed by Plaintiff Otillia Nicole Correa. (Cojocnean, Timothy). Modified on 10/6/2020 (jp).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First, Second, Third, Fourth, Fifth, Seventh and Eighth Cause of Action Motion for More Definitive Statement, Motion to Strike filed by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Cogbill, Karin)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Memorandum in Support of Motion #9 , for the following reasons: See Notice of Deficiency #10 ; Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely; Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Filer used the event Memorandum in Support of Motion which does not prompt the user to set a hearing before the judge. (lom)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Memorandum in Support of Motion #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Dismiss Party - under Category - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests. (2) Hearing information is missing. (3) Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. (4) Filer used the event Memorandum in Support of Motion; which does not prompt the user to set a hearing before the judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 11 - MEMORANDUM in Support Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc.. (Cogbill, Karin) Modified on 9/18/2020 (lom).
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-00921 JLS (DFMx). Case transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:20-cv-01684-JLS-DFM. Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (jgu)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
September 4, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Amy Hegarty, Zillow Group, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Otillia Nicole Correa. Filed in State Court on 6/5/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 served on 9/4/20. (Cogbill, Karin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Cogbill, Karin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc.. (Cogbill, Karin)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01147522-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-27944737 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Zillow Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Karin Morgan Cogbill added to party Zillow Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cogbill, Karin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otillia Nicole Correa v. Zillow Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otillia Nicole Correa
Represented By: Timothy Michael Cojocnean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow Group, Inc.
Represented By: Karin Morgan Cogbill
Represented By: Jonathan A. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Hegarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?