Erriton Hall v. Suzuki Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Erriton Hall
Defendant: Suzuki Motor of America, Inc., Suzuki Motor Corporation, DOES 1-100, inclusive, and DOES 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2020cv01911
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 Filing 33 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan 8 - 10 days ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Erriton Hall.. (Davis, Travis)
November 23, 2020 Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court finds the Pltf's Motion to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #19 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for November 30, 2020 is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on this date and time. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 16, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #19 filed by Plaintiff Erriton Hall. (Davis, Travis)
November 16, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
November 13, 2020 Filing 29 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. The Court finds the Motion to Change Venue to Western District of Virginia filed by Deft's Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. #17 appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; Local Rule 7-15. Accordingly, the motion hearing set for NOVEMBER 23, 2020, is removed from the calendar and the motion is taken under submission. No appearances are necessary on November 23, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Reginald Roberts, Jr counsel for Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. Adding Shawn Patrick Thomas as counsel of record for Suzuki Motor Corporation and Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS Suzuki Motor Corporation and Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Roberts, Reginald)
November 13, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Reginald Roberts, Jr counsel for Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. Eric Scott Mintz is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS Suzuki Motor Corporation and Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Roberts, Reginald)
November 13, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Reginald Roberts, Jr counsel for Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. Darth Kadei Vaughn is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANTS Suzuki Motor Corporation and Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Roberts, Reginald)
November 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Reginald Roberts, Jr on behalf of Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. (Roberts, Reginald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #19 DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT, #2 Exhibit EX B TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT)(Roberts, Reginald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court #19 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF KEVIN FOLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND ACTION TO STATE COURT)(Roberts, Reginald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Virginia #17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406)(Roberts, Reginald)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Virginia #17 REPLY filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF KEVIN FOLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406)(Roberts, Reginald)
November 5, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Virginia #17 filed by Plaintiff Erriton Hall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Davis, Travis)
October 28, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Erriton Hall. Motion set for hearing on 11/30/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Travis)
October 23, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Virginia #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Change Venue to Western District of Virginia filed by DEFENDANTS Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE) (Roberts, Reginald)
October 16, 2020 Filing 16 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by DEFENDANT Suzuki Motor of America, Inc... (Roberts, Reginald)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
October 16, 2020 Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Case number now reads as 8:20-cv-01911 DOC(DFMx). (rn)
October 9, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) DEFENDANT SUZUKI MOTOR CORPORATIONS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ERRITON HALLS COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Suzuki Motor Corporation.(Roberts, Reginald)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Suzuki Motor Corporation, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CLERK AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT served on 10/7/2020. (Roberts, Reginald)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on December 3, 2020. (cw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the Notice to Attorney Admissions was docketed on the incorrect case. Please disregard the entry. (jtil)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
October 2, 2020 NON CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc., attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
October 2, 2020 COMPLAINT Filed by Plaintiff Erriton Hall in Orange County Superior Court on 2/7/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Roberts, Reginald)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc. (Roberts, Reginald)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Roberts, Reginald)
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 Defendants' NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor Corporation, Suzuki Motor of America, Inc., identifying Plaintiff Erriton Hall; Defendant Suzuki Motor Corporation; and Defendant Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.. (Roberts, Reginald)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01130663-CU-PL-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28363996 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Suzuki Motor of America, Inc., Suzuki Motor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Answer to Complaint, #3 Proof of Service of Summons) (Attorney Reginald Roberts, Jr added to party Suzuki Motor Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Reginald Roberts, Jr added to party Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Roberts, Reginald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erriton Hall v. Suzuki Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzuki Motor of America, Inc.
Represented By: Reginald Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Darth Kadei Vaughn
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Thomas
Represented By: Eric S Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzuki Motor Corporation
Represented By: Reginald Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Darth Kadei Vaughn
Represented By: Shawn Patrick Thomas
Represented By: Eric S Mintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erriton Hall
Represented By: Travis Eugene Davis
Represented By: Robert T Simon
Represented By: Edwin Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?