Deanna Washington v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Ms. Deanna R Washington and Deanna Washington
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2020cv01925
Filed: October 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV20-1925 JPR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
November 4, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attorney Marla K. Letellier added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(Letellier, Marla)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deanna Washington, upon Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 10/13/2020, answer due 2/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F DelaRosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to illegible. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Monge, Troy)
October 12, 2020 Filing 12 STATEMENT No conflict filed by Plaintiff Deanna Washington re: Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #10 . (Monge, Troy)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (es)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): Order re Possible Conflicts of Interest by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: No later than seven days from the date of this order, Plaintiff's counsel must file notice that ALJ Rosenbluth did or did not participate in or preside over Plaintiff's case. [See document for details.] (es)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (es)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: Granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Deanna R Washington. (Monge, Troy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Deanna R Washington. (Monge, Troy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Deanna R Washington. (Monge, Troy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deanna R Washington, (Monge, Troy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deanna R Washington. (Monge, Troy)
October 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Deanna R Washington. (Attorney Troy Dana Monge added to party Deanna R Washington(pty:pla))(Monge, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deanna Washington v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Marla K. Letellier
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Deanna R Washington
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Washington
Represented By: Troy Dana Monge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?