Javier Benitez et al v. Caliber Holdings Corporation
Plaintiff: Javier Benitez
Defendant: Caliber Bodyworks, Inc., Caliber Holdings Corporation doing business as Caliber Collision, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and Caliber Collision Centers, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv01978
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 12/18/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra- district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Autumn D. Spaeth. New Case Number 8:20-cv-01978 JLS (ADSx). (jtil)
October 9, 2020 NON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Caliber Bodyworks, Inc., Caliber Holdings Corporation, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
October 9, 2020 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Javier Benitez in Orange County Superior Court on 5/26/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Caliber Bodyworks, Inc., Caliber Holdings Corporation identifying CH Hold Corp. as Corporate Parent. (Gonell, Carrie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants Caliber Bodyworks, Inc., Caliber Holdings Corporation. (Gonell, Carrie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Caliber Bodyworks, Inc., Caliber Holdings Corporation. (Gonell, Carrie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Caliber Bodyworks, Inc., Caliber Holdings Corporation. (Gonell, Carrie)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01140410-CU-OE-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28474554 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Caliber Holdings Corporation, Caliber Bodyworks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Declaration of Robyn Baccus in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #4 Declaration of Sherry Seibert in Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court) (Attorney Carrie A Gonell added to party Caliber Holdings Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie A Gonell added to party Caliber Bodyworks, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gonell, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javier Benitez et al v. Caliber Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Bodyworks, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy My Ngoc Nguyen
Represented By: Carrie A Gonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Holdings Corporation doing business as Caliber Collision
Represented By: Nancy My Ngoc Nguyen
Represented By: Carrie A Gonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Collision Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Nancy My Ngoc Nguyen
Represented By: Carrie A Gonell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Benitez
Represented By: Tyler C Vanderpool
Represented By: James R Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?