Ten-X, Inc. v. Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation and Ten-X, Inc.
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company and Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC
Counter Defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc., 5900 LLC and Bradd M Caplan
Counter Claimant: M.D. Azhar Pasha
Case Number: 8:2020cv02004
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: James V Selna
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Azhar Pasha, Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #11 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #10 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Summons Issued #14 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 Counter-Defendant Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc. served on Summons; Answer and Counterclaims; Certificate of Interested Parties; Notice of Case Assignment; Initial Order; Notices re ADR Program. (Hipps, Kathleen)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM #19 , by Judge James V. Selna. Crossdefendant 5900 LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Counterclaim on or before January 8, 2021. (es)
December 11, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Azhar Pasha, Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #11 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #10 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Summons Issued #14 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on Summons; Answer and Counterclaims; Certificate of Interested Parties; Notice of Case Assignment; Initial Order; Notices re ADR Program. (Hipps, Kathleen)
December 11, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Counterclaim filed by Counterdefendant 5900 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Matthew Jason Negrin added to party 5900 LLC(pty:cd))(Negrin, Matthew)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR COUNTER-DEFENDANT JONES LANG LASALLE AMERICAS, INC. TO FILE ITS RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO THE COUNTER-CLAIM #17 , by Judge James V. Selna. The responsive pleadings filed by JLL as to the Counter-Claim on or before January 8, 2021 shall be deemed timely. (es)
December 10, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #10 filed by Counter-Defendant Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney James C Castle added to party Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.(pty:cd))(Castle, James)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSSCLAIM, #15 by Judge James V. Selna. Plaintiff and Crossdefendant Ten-X, Inc. and Crossdefendant Bradd Caplan shall answer or otherwise respond to the Crossclaim on or before January 8, 2021. (es)
December 8, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Counterclaim filed by Counterdefendant TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Brandon Scott Reif added to party TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:cd))(Reif, Brandon)
November 20, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #10 as to CounterDefendant 5900 LLC, Bradd M Caplan, Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.. (es)
November 19, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim, #10 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Jones Lang LaSalle Americas, Inc., #2 Summons - 5900 LLC)(Hipps, Kathleen)
November 16, 2020 Filing 12 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Ten-X, Inc., upon Defendant Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC served on 10/29/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Reif, Brandon)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC, identifying Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC and Azhar Pasha. (Hipps, Kathleen)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC filed by Defendant Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC.(Attorney Kathleen Cerniglia Hipps added to party Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC(pty:dft))(Hipps, Kathleen)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 10:30 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 1/4/2021. (lb)
October 22, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC. (ghap)
October 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation, (Reif, Brandon)
October 19, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Reif, Brandon)
October 19, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Reif, Brandon)
October 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28603757 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation. (Attorney Brandon Scott Reif added to party TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation(pty:pla))(Reif, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ten-X, Inc. v. Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC, a Maryland limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasha Realty Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Doyle
Represented By: Kathleen Cerniglia Hipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEN-X, INC., a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Brandon Scott Reif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ten-X, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Scott Reif
Represented By: Rachel D Dardashti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jones Lang Lasalle Americas, Inc.
Represented By: James C Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: 5900 LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jason Negrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bradd M Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: M.D. Azhar Pasha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?