Off-White LLC v. Afters Ice Cream, Inc.
Plaintiff: Off-White LLC
Defendant: Afters Ice Cream, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02121
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
December 22, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Befores, LLC d/b/a Afters Ice Cream, erroneously sued and served as Afters Ice Cream, Inc., (White, Clifford)
December 22, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Befores, LLC d/b/a Afters Ice Cream, erroneously sued and served as Afters Ice Cream, Inc..(Attorney Clifford L White added to party Afters Ice Cream, Inc.(pty:dft))(White, Clifford)
December 4, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC, upon Defendant Afters Ice Cream, Inc. served on 12/1/2020, answer due 12/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicholas D. Myers in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Farnese, Peter)
November 12, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney William C. Wright on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 12, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jason M. Drangel on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Brian Igel on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Kerry B. Brownlee on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Ashley E. Sands on behalf of Plaintiff Off-White LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Brian Igel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kerry B. Brownlee. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ashly E. Sands. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William C. Wright. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jason M. Drangel. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Afters Ice Cream, Inc. (jtil)
November 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
November 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC, (Farnese, Peter)
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Off-White LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC. (Farnese, Peter)
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28841735 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Off-White LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Peter J. Farnese added to party Off-White LLC(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Off-White LLC v. Afters Ice Cream, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Off-White LLC
Represented By: Peter J. Farnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Afters Ice Cream, Inc.
Represented By: Clifford L White
Represented By: Nicholas Duane Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?