Jack Schechter v. Viking Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jack Schechter
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive, The Viking Corporation, Supply Network, Inc. doing business as Viking Supplynet, a corporation and Viking Group, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02155
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 26 REPORT of Rule 26 filed by Plaintiff Jack Schechter. (Wiseman, Brett)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 1/15/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation, Viking Group, Inc., re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #6 Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton served on November 9, 2020. (McMahan, Troy)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:20-cv-02155-JLS-DFMx. (car)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation, Viking Group, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,, #1 served on November 6, 2020. (McMahan, Troy)
November 5, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation, Viking Group, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jack Schechter. Filed in State Court on 10/18/19 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation, Viking Group, Inc., identifying Viking Group, Inc.; Minimax Viking Group. (McMahan, Troy)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation, Viking Group, Inc.. (McMahan, Troy)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01162305-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-28867235 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Supply Network, Inc., The Viking Corporation, Viking Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet (State), #4 Exhibit D - ADR Information Packet, #5 Exhibit E - Petition to Confirm, Correct, or Vacate Attorney-Client Fee Arbitration Award, #6 Exhibit F - Rejection of Award and Request for Trial After Arbitration, #7 Exhibit G - Report of Referee, #8 Exhibit H - Request for Trial de Novo After Judicial Arbitration, #9 Exhibit I - Statement of Agreement or Nonagreement, #10 Exhibit J - Stipulation or Motion for Order Appointing Referee, #11 Exhibit K - Answers to Complaint (State), #12 Exhibit L - 10-14-20 Notice of Hearing, #13 Exhibit M - Proof of Service of Summons (Viking Corp), #14 Exhibit N - 10-21-20 - Notice of Hearing, #15 Exhibit O - Proof of Service of Summons (Supply Network), #16 Exhibit P - Proof of Service of Summons (Viking Group), #17 Exhibit Q - 10-30-20 Notice of Hearing) (Attorney Troy D McMahan added to party Supply Network, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Troy D McMahan added to party The Viking Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Troy D McMahan added to party Viking Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(McMahan, Troy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jack Schechter v. Viking Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Viking Corporation
Represented By: Carter Lyon George
Represented By: Troy D McMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supply Network, Inc. doing business as Viking Supplynet, a corporation
Represented By: Carter Lyon George
Represented By: Troy D McMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Group, Inc.
Represented By: Carter Lyon George
Represented By: Troy D McMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Schechter
Represented By: Susanna Fyfe Wiseman
Represented By: Brett K Wiseman
Represented By: Ali Parvaneh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?