Better Mouse Company, LLC v. Kingston Technology Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Defendant: Kingston Technology Company, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02166
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
December 31, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc., identifying Kingston Technology Cooperation. (McBride, Kevin)
December 31, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc..(McBride, Kevin)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: Granting #19 Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Better Mouse Company LLC Plaintiff, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. Granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Better Mouse Company LLC Plaintiff, designating Steven W. Ritcheson as local counsel. (twdb)
December 18, 2020 Filing 21 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 11, 2020 Filing 19 Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 11/30/2020, Receipt No. 29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate, #2 Proposed Order) (Ritcheson, Steven)
December 10, 2020 Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. Counsel are ordered to file a corrected Application of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. no later than December 18, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264532) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (Thrasher, Lupe)
November 30, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Hao Ni to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29264532) filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 25, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Clark Gordon counsel for Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. Adding Clark Gordon as counsel of record for Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. (Attorney Clark Gordon added to party Kingston Technology Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gordon, Clark)
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brock Forrest Wilson counsel for Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. Adding Brock F. Wilson as counsel of record for Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. (Attorney Brock Forrest Wilson added to party Kingston Technology Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wilson, Brock)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kingston Technology Company, Inc. answer now due 1/3/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. Kingston Technology Company, Inc..(McBride, Kevin)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kevin G McBride counsel for Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. Adding Kevin G. McBride as counsel of record for Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc.. (Attorney Kevin G McBride added to party Kingston Technology Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(McBride, Kevin)
November 10, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Hoa Ni. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Kingston Technology Company, Inc. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:20-cv-02166 DOC (KESx). (esa)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC identifying NONE as Corporate Parent. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Ritcheson, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28926839 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Better Mouse Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Steven W. Ritcheson added to party Better Mouse Company, LLC(pty:pla))(Ritcheson, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Better Mouse Company, LLC v. Kingston Technology Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Better Mouse Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven W. Ritcheson
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Steven W Ritcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Technology Company, Inc.
Represented By: Brock Forrest Wilson
Represented By: Kevin G McBride
Represented By: Clark Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?