Matthew E Orso v. Todd Disner, et al
Plaintiff: Matthew E Orso in his capacity as court-appointed Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC doing business as ZeekRewards.com
Defendant: Trudy Gilmond, David Kettner, David Sorrells, Durant Brockett, Mary Kettner, Darren Miller, Trudy Gilmond, LLC, Karen Silver, Michael Van Leeuwen, Innovation Marketing, LLC, Shara Andrews, T. Lemont Silver, P.A.W.S. Capital Management LLC, Lori Jean Weber, Todd Disner, Global Internet Formula, Inc., Rhonda Gates, Nelda Thomas, Class of Net Winners in Zeekrewards.com, Jerry Napier and Aaron Andrews
Petitioner: Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02174
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER 26 . Due to clerical error, the image was not attached to the docket entry and will be re-docketed. (yl)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER #23 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. ABC Legal services Inc., who employs persons of at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not a party to the within action is authorized and appointed to serve the writs in the above case. The US Marshals Office will remain the Leyving Officer. (yl)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 **REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR** ORDER FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS OF REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER #23 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: ABC Legal services Inc., who employs persons of at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not a party to the within action is authorized and appointed to serve the writs in the above case. The US Marshal's Office will remain the Leyving Officer. (yl) Modified on 11/19/2020 (yl).
November 17, 2020 Filing 25 Writ of Execution issued against Class of Net Winners (NELDA THOMAS) re: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #22 . (yl)
November 17, 2020 Filing 23 REQUEST for Order for Order for service of process by registered process server filed by movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Carruthers, Dennis)
November 17, 2020 Filing 22 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Execution)(Carruthers, Dennis)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Request #16 , Affidavit #14 , for the following reasons: Case number is incorrect or missing. (iv)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF PROCESS BY REGISTERED PROCESS SERVER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. ABC Legal Services, Inc. who employs person at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not a party to the within action is authorized to appointed to serve the writs in the above case. The US Marshal's Office will remain the Levying Officer. #16 (yl)
November 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Order for Order for service of process by registered process server #16 , Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
November 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the incorrect document was attached to document 18 and will be re-filed. #18 (yl)
November 13, 2020 Filing 18 **REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR #20 ** NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Order for Order for service of process by registered process server #16 , Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) Modified on 11/13/2020 (yl).
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of New Case Number and Judge Assignment by Clerk. This case is hereby converted from case type MC to case type CV because subsequent filings have changed the nature of the case. A new case number has therefore been assigned to this case. District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez is assigned to this new case number 8:20-cv-02174-PSG. All future documents must be filed under this new case number. The previous case number, 8:20-mc-00016-UA, is hereby terminated. (car)
November 11, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST for Order for Order for service of process by registered process server filed by movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order order for serivice of process by registered process server) (Carruthers, Dennis)
November 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Writ already issued, see document #10 , e-filed on 9/29/2020. (bm)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF EXECUTION, #2 SERVER FORM)(Carruthers, Dennis)
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests ---> Order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 ABSTRACT of Judgment issued in favor of Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc. and against Class of Net Winners in Zeekrewards.com (Nelda Thomas) in the principal amount of $ 7537.74, interest in the amount of $ 305.89, attorneys fees of $ 0.00, costs of $ 0.00; RE: MISC - Registration of Judgment from Another District #1 . (lom) Modified on 10/21/2020 (lom).
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Carruthers, Dennis)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Writ of Execution issued against Nelda Thomas. (yl)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: he name of the judgment creditor, Nelda Thomas is not in the Registration of Judgment nor on the docket. (yl) Modified on 9/25/2020 (yl).
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: Entered date listed on the writ/abstract does not match the entered date of the judgment/order. (yl)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: The name of the judgment creditor, Nelda Thomas is not in the Registration of Judgment nor on the docket. (yl)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 writ of execution)(Carruthers, Dennis)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 writ of execution)(Carruthers, Dennis)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 writ of execution)(Carruthers, Dennis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY WRIT OF EXECUTION. The document is being returned to you for correction of: The amount(s) listed in writ/abstract do(es) not coincide with the amount(s) in the judgment/order. Total amounts must be exact amounts or less than the judgment. (bm)
September 14, 2020 Filing 2 Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Movant Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Execution)(Carruthers, Dennis)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 REGISTRATION OF JUDGMENT FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: ACACDC-27721464 - Fee: $47, filed by Petitioner Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.. (Attorney Dennis Scott Carruthers added to party Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.(pty:pet))(Carruthers, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthew E Orso v. Todd Disner, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nationwide Judgment Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis Scott Carruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Gilmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sorrells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durant Brockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Kettner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Gilmond, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Van Leeuwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovation Marketing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shara Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lemont Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.W.S. Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Jean Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Disner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Internet Formula, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelda Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Class of Net Winners in Zeekrewards.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew E Orso in his capacity as court-appointed Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC doing business as ZeekRewards.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?