Rafael Arroyo v. CPLG Properties L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Rafael Arroyo
Defendant: CPLG Properties L.L.C., LQ Management LLC, DOES 1-10 and Corepoint TRS L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2020cv02450
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Douglas F. McCormick. New Case Number 8:20-cv-02450 DOC (DFMx). (jtil)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendants LQ MANAGEMENT L.L.C., Corepoint TRS L.L.C., CPLG Properties L.L.C..(Arnett, Ashley)
December 30, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rafael Arroyo in Orange County Superior Court on 11/25/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CPLG Properties L.L.C., Corepoint TRS L.L.C., LQ MANAGEMENT L.L.C., re Declaration, #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 12/30/2020. (Arnett, Ashley)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 Defendants' Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CPLG Properties L.L.C., Corepoint TRS L.L.C., LQ MANAGEMENT L.L.C., identifying CPLG L.L.C., CorePoint Borrower L.L.C., La Quinta Intermediate Holdings, LLC and Wyndham Hotel Group, LLC. (Arnett, Ashley)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Ashley N. Arnett re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants CPLG Properties L.L.C., Corepoint TRS L.L.C., LQ MANAGEMENT L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley N. Arnett In Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal)(Arnett, Ashley)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CPLG Properties L.L.C., Corepoint TRS L.L.C., LQ MANAGEMENT L.L.C.. (Arnett, Ashley)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2020-01171973 Receipt No: ACACDC-29787084 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants LQ MANAGEMENT L.L.C., Corepoint TRS L.L.C., CPLG Properties L.L.C.. (Attorney Ashley Nicole Arnett added to party CPLG Properties L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Nicole Arnett added to party Corepoint TRS L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashley Nicole Arnett added to party LQ MANAGEMENT L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Arnett, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rafael Arroyo v. CPLG Properties L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPLG Properties L.L.C.
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LQ Management LLC
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corepoint TRS L.L.C.
Represented By: Ashley Nicole Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Arroyo
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?