Chelsea Johnson v. Chapman University et al
Plaintiff: Chelsea Johnson
Defendant: 1 through 10, Inclusive, Jerry Price, Ph.D., individually and as Vice President for Student Affairs and Dean of Students of Chapman University, Daniele C. Struppa, Ph.D., individually and as president of Chapman University, Board Of Trustees Of Chapman University, Jason McAlexander, individually and as Director of Disability Services at Chapman University, Chapman University, Does 1 through 25, inclusive (see page 4 of A/C), Daniele C. Struppa, Ph.D., Jason McAlexander and Jerry Price, Ph.D.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00019
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Chapman University. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Aaron Schu, #3 Proposed Order) (Schu, Aaron)
February 12, 2021 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by CHELSEA JOHNSON Chelsea Johnson(Tytell, Andrea)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 First STIPULATION to AMEND filed by CHELSEA JOHNSON Chelsea Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Tytell, Andrea)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chapman University answer now due 2/12/2021, filed by Defendant Chapman University.(Schu, Aaron)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
January 6, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Board of Trustees of Chapman University, Chapman University, Does, Jason McAlexander, Jerry Price, Ph.D., Daniele C. Struppa, Ph.D. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Chelsea Johnson. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Chapman University, identifying Chelsea Johnson, Chapman University, Board of Trustees of Chapman University, Daniele C. Struppa, Jerry Price, Jason McAlexander. (Plevin, Fred)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Chapman University. (Plevin, Fred)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2020-01131276 Receipt No: ACACDC-29899776 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Chapman University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Fred M Plevin added to party Chapman University(pty:dft))(Plevin, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chelsea Johnson v. Chapman University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Johnson
Represented By: Andrea M Tytell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1 through 10, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Price, Ph.D., individually and as Vice President for Student Affairs and Dean of Students of Chapman University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniele C. Struppa, Ph.D., individually and as president of Chapman University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board Of Trustees Of Chapman University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McAlexander, individually and as Director of Disability Services at Chapman University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman University
Represented By: Fred M Plevin
Represented By: Aaron J Schu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive (see page 4 of A/C)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniele C. Struppa, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason McAlexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Price, Ph.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?