Orlando Garcia v. Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Defendant: Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P., Ayres Hotel Company, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 8:2021cv00079
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #15 . Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc. answer due 4/16/2021; Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P. answer due 4/16/2021. (twdb)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 4/16/21 filed by Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reeves, Rex)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #13 . Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc. answer due 3/19/2021; Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P. answer due 3/19/2021. (twdb)
February 12, 2021 Filing 13 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 3/19/2021 filed by Attorney for Defendant Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reeves, Rex)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Percy Anderson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-00207-PA-JC. (rrp)
January 20, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P., re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #4 served on 1/15/2021. (Reeves, Rex)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P.. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-00207-PA-JC; 8:21-cv-00078-JLS-JDE; 8:21-cv-00089; 8:21-cv-00082 (Attachments: #1 POS on Defendants' Notice of Related Cases)(Reeves, Rex)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Attorney for Defendant Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P..(Reeves, Rex)
January 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P., Does 1-10, filed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Ayres Hotel Company, Inc. served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chase Ayres, Person in Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Orlando Garcia, upon Defendant Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P. served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Donald B. Ayres Jr., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/11/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P., (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Re Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Reeves, Rex)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 POS on Civil Cover Sheet)(Reeves, Rex)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State of California-County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01174071 Receipt No: ACACDC-30047896 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Ayres Hotel Company, Inc., Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 POS to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Rex T Reeves added to party Ayres Hotel Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rex T Reeves added to party Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P.(pty:dft))(Reeves, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Garcia v. Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayres-Laguna Woods, L.P.
Represented By: Rex T Reeves
Represented By: Michael Joseph Karlin
Represented By: Larry Scott Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayres Hotel Company, Inc.
Represented By: Rex T Reeves
Represented By: Michael Joseph Karlin
Represented By: Larry Scott Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?