Helios Streaming, LLC et al v. Fandango Media, LLC
Plaintiff: Helios Streaming, LLC
Counter Defendant: Ideahub, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Fandango Media, LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00211
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: John A Kronstadt
2 Judge: Douglas F McCormick
3 Judge: Mark C Scarsi
4 Judge: James V Selna
5 Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
6 Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 105 SUPPLEMENT - Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2021 Filing 104 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review With Appendix A #67 filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Memorandum Opinion)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Stay [ECF No. 67] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on October 25, 2021. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO SUBMIT SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING IN RELATION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF INTER PARTES REVIEW TO BRING A RECENT RULING TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION #101 by Judge John W. Holcomb: Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC and Ideahub, Inc. are GRANTED leave to submit a supplemental brief not to exceed three pages in relation to Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review. (See document for further details) (yl)
October 8, 2021 Filing 101 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file to Submit Supplemental Briefing re Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review to Bring a Recent Ruling to the Court's Attention filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Defendant's Supplemental Brief, #2 Exhibit 2. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief, #3 Proposed Order) (McWilliams, Rasheed)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: On its own motion, the Court hereby VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for October 1, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that Defendant's Motion to Stay [ECF No. 40] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on October 4, 2021. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 24, 2021 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Heming Xu counsel for Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. Adding Heming Xu as counsel of record for FANDANGO MEDIA, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FANDANGO MEDIA, LLC. (Attorney Heming Xu added to party Fandango Media, LLC(pty:dft))(Xu, Heming)
September 17, 2021 Filing 97 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Craft, Jeffrey)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL #77 by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court having considered Plaintiffs Helios Streaming LLC and Ideahub, Inc.'s and compelling reasons that over the presumption of public access having been shown, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Application. (See document for further details) (yl)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF DEFENDANTS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY PENDING RESOLUTION OF INTER PARTES' REVIEW #94 by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendant Fandango Media, LLC ("Fandango") Application for Leave of Court to File Under Seal the limited portions of Fandango's reply brief containing information discussing confidential agreements between the parties of this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
August 20, 2021 Filing 94 Corrected APPLICATION to file document Reply in Support of Motion to Stay under seal filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sharon Davis ISO Application, #2 Redacted Document Reply Brief ISO Motion to Stay, #3 Declaration of Sharon Davis ISO Reply Brief)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
August 20, 2021 Filing 93 ANSWER to Amended Counterclaim #87 - Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendant's First Amended Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc..(Craft, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva)
August 19, 2021 Filing 90 This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case transferred from Judge John A. Kronstadt to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:21-cv-00211 JWH (ADSx). (esa)
August 6, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (McWilliams, Rasheed)
August 6, 2021 Filing 87 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiffs Fandango Media, LLC amending Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #37 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC(McWilliams, Rasheed)
August 6, 2021 Filing 86 AMENDED ANSWER First Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement to Amended Complaint/Petition, #36 filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (McWilliams, Rasheed)
August 3, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION to file document Reply Brief in support of Motion to Stay under seal #82 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
August 2, 2021 Filing 84 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC, UNREDACTED Reply Brief served on 8/2/2021. (McWilliams, Rasheed)
August 2, 2021 Filing 83 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review With Appendix A #67 [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K, #4 Exhibit L, #5 Exhibit M)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
August 2, 2021 Filing 82 APPLICATION to file document Reply Brief in support of Motion to Stay under seal filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Unredacted Document Reply)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO WITHDRAW HELIOS'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #52 ) AND FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE AN AMENDED ANSWER (DKT. #80 ) by Judge John A. Kronstad, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Defendant Fandango Media, LLC's Counterclaims (Dkt. 52) is deemed withdrawn without prejudice. Defendant shall file an amended answer on or before 8/6/2021. Defendant's amended answer shall not contain any counterclaims related to the '830 and '414 patents, which are withdrawn without prejudice. Nothing in this Order shall prejudice Defendant's ability to amend its answers or counterclaims in the future. (jp)
July 23, 2021 Filing 80 Joint STIPULATION to Withdraw Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims #52 and for Defendants to file an Amended Answer filed by Plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
July 23, 2021 Filing 79 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss (cause or other) #52 filed by Plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC. (Craft, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2021 Filing 78 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay and supporting Declaration under seal #77 filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Opposition to Motion to Stay, #2 Unredacted Document Declaration of Leonard Monfredo)(Craft, Jeffrey)
July 19, 2021 Filing 77 APPLICATION to file document Portions of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay and supporting Declaration under seal filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Craft, #2 Redacted Document Opposition to Motion to Stay, #3 Redacted Document Declaration of Leonard Monfredo, #4 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #75 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss Defendant Fandango Media, LLC's Counterclaims (Dkt. #52 ) on or before 7/23/2021. (jp)
July 15, 2021 Filing 75 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DISMISS (Dkt. 52) filed by plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PENDING IPR (DKT. #73 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay (the "Motion" (Dkt. #67 )) on or before 7/19/2021. Defendant shall file any reply in support of the Motion on or before 8/2/2021. (jp)
July 7, 2021 Filing 73 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay to July 19, 2021 filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #71 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss Defendant Fandango Media, LLC's Counterclaims (Dkt. #52 ) is extended to 7/16/2021. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production and First Set of Interrogatories is extended to 8/9/2021. (jp)
July 2, 2021 Filing 71 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 52) filed by plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review With Appendix A #67 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Order attached. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. #68 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a reply in support of their Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims (Dkt. #52 ) is extended to July 9, 2021. (lom)
June 23, 2021 Filing 68 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss filed by plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Resolution of Inter Partes Review With Appendix A filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (McWilliams, Rasheed)
June 21, 2021 Filing 66 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule #40 PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey)
June 21, 2021 Filing 65 SEALED DOCUMENT PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #63 filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc..(Craft, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR[-]REPLY TO FANDANGO MEDIA, LLCS MOTION TO STAY UNDER THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE (DKT. #61 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Request is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file the proposed sur-reply attached as an exhibit to the Request on or before 6/21/2021. (jp)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TOFILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. #59 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Application is GRANTED. The portions of Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply in Opposition to Fandango Media, LLC's Motion to Stay under the First-to-File Rule identified by the Application shall be filed under seal. (jp)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STAY PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-TOFILE RULE (DKT. #53 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Application is GRANTED. The portions of Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule that were identified by the Application, and the portions of the Declaration of Rema Morgan-Aluko that were identified by the Application, shall be filed under seal. (jp)
June 16, 2021 Filing 61 REQUEST for Leave to file Sur-reply Brief in Response to Fandango Media, LLC's Reply Brief (Dkt. 57) filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 (Redacted)) (Craft, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2021 Filing 60 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document portions of Plaintiffs' surreply (Exhibit 1 to Request for Leave to File Surreply filed concurrently) under seal #59 filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Craft, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2021 Filing 59 APPLICATION to file document portions of Plaintiffs' surreply (Exhibit 1 to Request for Leave to File Surreply filed concurrently) under seal filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Document)(Craft, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2021 Filing 58 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims #52 filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (McWilliams, Rasheed)
June 10, 2021 Filing 57 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule #40 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #49 filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Declaration of Rema Morgan-Aluko)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL (DKT. #53 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Local Rule 79-5.2.2(a)(iv) provides that an application to file documents under seal must be accompanied by "[a]n unredacted version of the document(s) proposed to be filed under seal, conspicuously labeled 'UNREDACTED VERSION OF DOCUMENT PROPOSED TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL,' with any proposed redactions highlighted." Defendant has filed an Application for Leave to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule (the "Application" (Dkt. #53 )), but the Application includes only redacted versions of the documents sought to be filed under seal. On or before June 14, 2021, Defendant shall file under seal an unredacted version of the documents sought to be filed under seal, with any proposed redactions highlighted. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jaklc2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 9, 2021 Filing 55 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule #40 filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Declaration of Rema Morgan-Aluko)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
June 9, 2021 Filing 54 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC, Served on 6/9/21 served on Unredacted Version of Reply and Declaration. (McWilliams, Rasheed)
June 9, 2021 Filing 53 APPLICATION to file document Reply and Declaration under seal filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration by Sharon Davis ISO Application, #2 Declaration by Kerry Samovar ISO Application, #3 Redacted Document Reply, #4 Redacted Document Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(McWilliams, Rasheed)
May 21, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims filed by plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Craft, Jeffrey)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 AMENDED ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. A hearing is not necessary and, therefore, the matter is taken under submission. Upon review of the Joint Report, a scheduling order will be issued. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by August 20, 2021. This Order supersedes the Order Setting Scheduling Conference (Dkt. #46 ) that was issued on May 7, 2021. (tj)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE (DKT. #40 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: Defendant has set the motion for a day the Court's calendar is full and, therefore, closed. The Court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from June 7, 2021 to October 4, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule of motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant General Order 21-01. ORDER case transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-00211 JAK(ADSx). Signed by Judge Mark C. Scars and Judge John A. Kronstadt. (rn)
May 17, 2021 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule #40 filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING THE TIME OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION (ECF No. #40 ) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court, on its own motion, advances the time of the Motion to Stay Case Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule #40 , currently set for June 7, 2021, from 1:30 p.m. to 9:00 a.m. before Judge Mark C. Scarsi, in Courtroom 7C of the First Street Courthouse, located at 350 W. First Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Counsel shall refer to the Court's Standing Order with respect to the briefing schedule for motions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
May 7, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - pursuant to GO 21-01 (CV-52), #42 Incorrect defendant indicated in the document. Attached is the CV 52 form that has the correct defendant. (Attachments: #1 cv52) (rn)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:21-cv-00211 MCS(ADSx). (rn)
May 7, 2021 Filing 41 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: As the Court will be recusing on this matter, the Video Conference Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2021 at 10:00 am is VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 5, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (McWilliams, Rasheed)
May 4, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC, (McWilliams, Rasheed)
May 3, 2021 Filing 38 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Craft, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2021 Filing 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #36 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc. filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC.(McWilliams, Rasheed)
April 16, 2021 Filing 36 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Fandango Media, LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Craft, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna. The Court hereby Orders that the parties' Joint Stipulation for Modification of Rule 26(f) Conference Schedule is GRANTED, and the Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) scheduling conferences Helios Streaming, LLC et. al. v. Fandango Media LLC, C.A., Case No. 8:21-cv-00211-JVS-ADS is continued from April 19, 2021 to May 10, 2021 at 10:30 am. #34 (es)
April 1, 2021 Filing 34 STIPULATION to Reschedule - Joint Stipulation to Modify Fed R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference Schedule filed by plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer #32 by Judge James V. Selna. The deadline for Defendant to file its response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended until and including April 19, 2021. The deadline for Plaintiffs to amend their Complaint pursuant to Rule 15(a)(1)(A) is extended until and including May 19, 2021. (es)
March 12, 2021 Filing 32 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, filed by Plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Craft, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2021 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc., upon Defendant Fandango Media, LLC served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Craft, Jeffrey)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Lieberman APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC, designating Rasheed McWilliams as local counsel. (es)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Sharon L. Davis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC, designating Rasheed McWilliams as local counsel. (es)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Maisel APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC, designating Rasheed McWilliams as local counsel. (es)
March 5, 2021 Filing 27 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Lieberman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30865508) filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McWilliams, Rasheed)
March 5, 2021 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sharon L. Davis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30865442) filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McWilliams, Rasheed)
March 5, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jennifer B. Maisel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30865316) filed by Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McWilliams, Rasheed)
March 5, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rasheed McWilliams on behalf of Defendant Fandango Media, LLC (Attorney Rasheed McWilliams added to party Fandango Media, LLC(pty:dft))(McWilliams, Rasheed)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Leonard Monfredo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Helios Streaming LLC and Ideahub, Inc., designating Jeffrey E. Craft as local counsel. (es)
February 25, 2021 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Leonard Monfredo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30716859) filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Craft, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2021 Filing 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (es)
February 23, 2021 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff(s) Helios Streaming, LLC and Ideahub, Inc, designating Jeffrey F. Craft as local counsel. (es)
February 11, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30508885) filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Craft, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 04/26/2021 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 04/19/2021 (kdu)
February 5, 2021 Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-02140 JVS (ADSx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick and Judge Josephine L. Staton to Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-00211 JVS (ADSx). Signed by Judge James V. Selna. (eva)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
February 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Timothy Devlin on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
February 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Leonard A Monfredo on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Fandango Media, LLC. (et)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-2140 (Craft, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Craft, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc. (Craft, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Craft, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Craft, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30323434 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Helios Streaming, LLC, Ideahub, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Attorney Jeffrey Francis Craft added to party Helios Streaming, LLC (pty:pla), Attorney Jeffrey Francis Craft added to party Ideahub, Inc. (pty:pla))(Craft, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helios Streaming, LLC et al v. Fandango Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helios Streaming, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Craft
Represented By: Leonard A. Monfredo
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ideahub, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Francis Craft
Represented By: Leonard A. Monfredo
Represented By: Timothy Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Fandango Media, LLC
Represented By: Rasheed McWilliams
Represented By: Steven M. Lieberman
Represented By: Jennifer B. Maisel
Represented By: Sharon L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?