Bruce Brainerd v. Marriott International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bruce Brainerd
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation, DOES 1 through 25, inclusive and Marriott International, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2021cv00271
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 17 REPORT of Parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Conference filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. (Rodriguez, Lisa)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Grace E. Speights APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Marriott International, Inc, designating Lisa M. Rodriguez as local counsel. (lom)
March 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #14 Counsel provided a Certificate Concerning Discipline and/or Administrative Suspension not a Certificate of Good Standing. It will be accepted as a proof of good standing for the DC Bar. (lt)
March 25, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Grace E. Speights to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Marriott International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30980140) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
March 24, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Grace E. Speights to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Marriott International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30980140) filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G. Speights Certificate of Good Standing PA, #2 Exhibit B - G. Speights Certificate of Good Standing DC, #3 Proposed Order) (Rodriguez, Lisa)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of interested party. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
February 19, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Bruce Brainerd. (Easley, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Bruce Brainerd.. (Easley, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on Apr 15, 2021. (rrp)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil)
February 10, 2021 NON CONFORMED COPY ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant Marriott International, Inc., attached as Exhibit B. (jtil)
February 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Bruce Brainerd in Orange County Superior Court on 1/4/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE Corporate Disclosures filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation. (Rodriguez, Lisa)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation. (Rodriguez, Lisa)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation, (Rodriguez, Lisa)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation. (Rodriguez, Lisa)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01176973-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-30493592 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lisa Rodriguez ISO Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A (Complaint) to Declaration of Lisa Rodriguez ISO Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B (Answer) to Declaration of Lisa Rodriguez ISO Notice of Removal, #4 Declaration Declaration of Julie Colwell ISO Notice of Removal) (Attorney Lisa Marie Rodriguez added to party Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation(pty:dft))(Rodriguez, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Brainerd v. Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc. a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Rodriguez
Represented By: Grace E. Speights
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Brainerd
Represented By: Jeffrey Dana Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?