Galaxy Oil Company v. Robert Ameeti
Plaintiff: Galaxy Oil Company
Defendant: Robert Ameeti
Case Number: 8:2021cv00311
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 28 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. as to Robert Ameeti. (Stowell, Joshua)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR PROOF OF SERVICE AND RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve Defendant and file a Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint by 4/13/2021. Further, the parties are ORDERED to file a stipulation and proposed order no later than 4/20/2021, setting a deadline for a response to the complaint. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #25 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (lom)
March 30, 2021 Filing 25 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by defendant Robert Ameeti. (lom)
March 29, 2021 Filing 24 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall transfer ownership of the domain name registration for www.galaxyoil.com to Plaintiff. In the event that Defendant does not transfer ownership of the domain name registration for www.galaxyoil.com to Plaintiff within 24 hours of this Order, Plaintiff is authorized to present this Court's order to GoDaddy and Domains by Proxy with instructions to transfer the ownership of the domain name registration for www.galaxyoil.com to Plaintiff. See order for details. (lom)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DKT. #9 , #19 ) by Judge Cormac J. Carney. For the foregoing reasons, the preliminary injunction and Plaintiff's request for clarification are GRANTED. A preliminary injunction will issue concurrent with this order. (lom)
March 29, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTES OF SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION held before Judge Cormac J. Carney. Hearing is held. Court and counsel confer. The Court takes the matter under submission; Order will issue. Court Reporter: Debbie Hino-Spaan. (lom)
March 29, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER #19 filed by Defendant Robert Ameeti. (cw)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO CONDUCT HEARING BY ZOOM by Judge Cormac J. Carney: In light of the Amended Notice from the Clerk of Court issued 2/2/2021 limiting all appearances in civil cases to telephone or video attendance, the Court has decided to conduct the SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION set for Monday 3/29/2021 at 1:30 p.m. by Zoom. Please log into zoom.us and use the following to connect: https://cacd-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1619671193?pwd=ZjFkaUlKWHIrbUduLytLWmUzSU5Pdz09 -- Webinar ID: 161 967 1193; Passcode: 267932. Tutorials and answers to questions may be found at: https://support.zoom.us. **THE COURT REQUESTS THAT ALL PARTICIPANTS ADDRESSING THE COURT UTILIZE HEADPHONES FOR THE HEARING.** Absent further order of the Court, counsel are reminded that this is a PUBLIC hearing. Pursuant to the Court's order: audio and/or video recording of any proceeding is strictly prohibited. **COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO ENSURE DEFENDANT PRO SE IS ADVISED OF THIS ORDER.** THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 19, 2021 Filing 19 REQUEST for Review of Order Granting TRO re Order, #18 filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration) (Stowell, Joshua)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, Granting EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order (Dkt. #9 ). Defendant is ORDERED to show cause, by March 16, 2021, as to why a preliminary injunction should not issue pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a). Any reply shall be filed by Plaintiff by March 22, 2021. The hearing on the Order to Show Cause shall be on March 29, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 8, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Galaxy Oils domain name and administrative passwords and Order to Show Cause #9 filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua Stowell, #2 Declaration of James Caiopoulos)(Stowell, Joshua)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Robert Ameeti. (cw)
March 5, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF GALAXY OIL COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #9 filed by Defendant Robert Ameeti. (cw)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES' REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (DKT. #13 ). Defendant shall submit his opposition by March 5, 2021. Plaintiff shall submit its reply by March 8, 2021. (twdb)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Galaxy Oils domain name and administrative passwords and Order to Show Cause #9 filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Stowell, Joshua)
March 1, 2021 Filing 12 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Galaxy Oils domain name and administrative passwords and Order to Show Cause #9 filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Stowell, Joshua)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying #9 Plaintiff's APPLICATION for TRO. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to meet and confer with Defendant and propose a briefing schedule concerning Defendants opposition to the TRO and Plaintiffs reply. After the briefing has been completed, the Court will schedule a hearing if necessary. (twdb)
February 23, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Mack Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company, who will not be appearing as an attorney of record in this case. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due or Order re PHV. PHV fee N/A. (sbou)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Galaxy Oils domain name and administrative passwords and Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of James Caiopoulos, #3 Declaration of M Richards, #4 Proposed Order) (Stowell, Joshua)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mack Montgomery. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
February 18, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Robert Ameeti. (jtil)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company, (Friedland, Michael)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Friedland, Michael)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Friedland, Michael)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30581947 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Galaxy Oil Company. (Attorney Michael K Friedland added to party Galaxy Oil Company (pty:pla))(Friedland, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galaxy Oil Company v. Robert Ameeti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galaxy Oil Company
Represented By: Michael K Friedland
Represented By: Joshua J Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ameeti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?