Tara Jessop v. Jenna Marie Rammell et al
Plaintiff: Tara Jessop
Defendant: Andrew James Rammell and Jenna Marie Rammell
Case Number: 8:2021cv00315
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 27 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop.. (Hottinger, Tyson)
April 16, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Pro Hac Application filed by Defendant Andrew James Rammell, Jenna Marie Rammell. (Dossier, Claire)
April 7, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kade N. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Andrew James Rammell, Jenna Marie Rammell (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-31050607) #23 by Judge James V. Selna. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 04/16/2021. (es)
April 6, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kade N. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Andrew James Rammell, Jenna Marie Rammell (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-31050607) #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
April 6, 2021 Filing 23 [STRICKEN #25 ] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kade N. Olsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Andrew James Rammell, Jenna Marie Rammell (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-31050607) filed by Defendant Andrew James Rammell, Jenna Marie Rammell. (Dossier, Claire) Modified on 4/7/2021 (es).
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
March 13, 2021 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Andrew James Rammell, Jenna Marie Rammell.(Attorney Claire Y Dossier added to party Andrew James Rammell(pty:dft), Attorney Claire Y Dossier added to party Jenna Marie Rammell(pty:dft))(Dossier, Claire)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 05/17/2021 at 10:30am am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 5/10/2021. (kdu)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENIED AS MOOT by Judge James V. Selna: Denying #18 REQUEST to Continue the March 15, 2021 Scheduling Conference. (es)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 REQUEST to Continue Scheduling Conference from March 15, 2021 filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hottinger, Tyson)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge James V. Selna: Granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Howell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tara Jessop, designating Tyson K. Hottinger as local counsel. (es)
March 1, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tara Jessop (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 2/26/2021, Receipt No. 30739961) filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tara Jessop (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30739961) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests.. Application.. Appear Pro Hac Vice. Note: Wrong event does not provide relief or changes sought. (lt)
February 26, 2021 Filing 14 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Howell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Tara Jessop (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30739961) filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop, upon Defendant Jenna Marie Rammell served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mckell Munn an individual of suitable age and discretion who resides at defendant's usual place of abode in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop, upon Defendant Andrew James Rammell served on 2/22/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mckell Munn an individual of suitable age and discretion who resides at defendant's usual place of abode in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael J Howell. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
February 19, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Jenna Marie Rammell. (car)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew James Rammell. (car)
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop, (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop. (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop. (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop. (Hottinger, Tyson)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30584229 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tara Jessop. (Attorney Tyson K Hottinger added to party Tara Jessop(pty:pla))(Hottinger, Tyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tara Jessop v. Jenna Marie Rammell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Jessop
Represented By: Tyson K Hottinger
Represented By: Tyson K. Hottinger
Represented By: Daniel R Barber
Represented By: Michael J. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew James Rammell
Represented By: Kade N. Olsen
Represented By: Claire Y. Dossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna Marie Rammell
Represented By: Kade N. Olsen
Represented By: Claire Y. Dossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?