United States of America v. Jose Pineda et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jose Pineda, ABK Income Tax & Travel, Inc., ABK Income Tax and Travel, Inc. and Jose Pineda individually doing business as ABK Income Tax and Travel
Case Number: 8:2021cv00463
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (See attached Order for complete details.) (kd)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant ABK Income Tax and Travel, Inc., Jose Pineda.(Attorney Dennis N Brager added to party ABK Income Tax and Travel, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Dennis N Brager added to party Jose Pineda(pty:dft))(Brager, Dennis)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant ABK Income Tax and Travel, Inc. served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Pineda in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shariff, Najah)
March 17, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Jose Pineda served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jose Pineda in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Shariff, Najah)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant ABK Income Tax and Travel, Inc. (ghap)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Shariff, Najah)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Shariff, Najah)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Najah J Shariff added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Shariff, Najah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jose Pineda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABK Income Tax & Travel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABK Income Tax and Travel, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis N Brager
Represented By: Guy Hyman Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Pineda individually doing business as ABK Income Tax and Travel
Represented By: Dennis N Brager
Represented By: Guy Hyman Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Najah J Shariff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?