Alec Glasser et al v. John B. Berzner
Plaintiff: Alec Glasser and The Drake in Laguna, LLC
Defendant: John B Berzner and DOES 1-20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv00661
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: James V Selna
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 16 [IN CHAMBERS] SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 set for 6/7/2021 at 1:30 pm is continued to 6/14/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 DEFENDANT JOHN B. BERZNERS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATIONS OF ALEC GLASSER; MAYA LANDA; AND GLENN NORTON In Support Of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) AND CAL. CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16 #10 filed by Defendant John B Berzner. (Bloch, William)
May 24, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) AND CAL. CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16 #10 filed by Defendant John B Berzner. (Bloch, William)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Dease, Janelle)
May 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) AND CAL. CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16 #10 Decl of Alec Glasser, Decl. of Maya Landa, Decl. of Glenn Norton, Decl. of Frank Mickadeit filed by Plaintiffs Alec Glasser, The Drake in Laguna, LLC. (Attorney Janelle M Dease added to party Alec Glasser(pty:pla), Attorney Janelle M Dease added to party The Drake in Laguna, LLC(pty:pla))(Dease, Janelle)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6) AND CAL. CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 425.16 filed by Defendant John B Berzner. Motion set for hearing on 6/7/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Berzner Dec., #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Berzner Dec., #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Berzner Dec., #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Berzner Dec, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Bloch Dec.) (Bloch, William)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 6/28/2021 at 11:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 6/21/2021. (lb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant John B Berzner, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 Electronically served on April 16, 2021. (Bloch, William)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The First Amended Complaint was inadvertently docketed as the Complaint. Please disregard the entry. (jtil)
April 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs The Drake in Laguna, LLC, Alec Glasser in Orange County Superior Court on 8/20/2020, attached as Exhibit C. (jtil)
April 9, 2021 (See Notice of Clerical error #4 )CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs The Drake in Laguna, LLC, Alec Glasser in Orange County Superior Court on 8/20/2020. (jtil) Modified on 4/13/2021 (jtil).
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant John B Berzner, (Bloch, William)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant John B Berzner. (Bloch, William)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The County of Orange, Central Justice Center, case number 30-2020-01146408-CU-DF-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31080223 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant John B Berzner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 First Amended Complaint, #3 Order on Application for Publication of Summons) (Attorney William W Bloch added to party John B Berzner(pty:dft))(Bloch, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alec Glasser et al v. John B. Berzner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Berzner
Represented By: William W Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Glasser
Represented By: Janelle M Dease
Represented By: Thomas John Borchard
Represented By: Frank J Mickadeit, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Drake in Laguna, LLC
Represented By: Janelle M Dease
Represented By: Thomas John Borchard
Represented By: Frank J Mickadeit, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?