United States of America v. Kathleen A. Reffert
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kathleen A. Reffert
Case Number: 8:2021cv00720
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodging of [Proposed] Order Enforcing Summons re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Show Cause Hearing - optional html form, #9 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Enforcing Summons)(Gill, Angela)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTES OF Hearing re: Order to Show Cause #6 held before Magistrate Judge John D. Early. Ms. Reffert advises that she intends to produce records in response to the Internal Revenue Service Summons, compliance with which is the basis for the underlying Petition (Dkt. 1). Following a discussion, neither party objections to a compliance deadline of 45 days from the date of the hearing. Counsel for the government will submit a proposed order. Court Recorder: CS 05/25/21. (hr)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Kathleen A. Reffert served on 5/7/2021, answer due 5/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathleen A. Reffert in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Gill, Angela)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner United States of America, served on 04/28/2021. (Gill, Angela)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge John D. Early. IT IS ORDERED that Respondent appear before this District Court of the United States for the Central District of California, at the following date, time, and address, to show cause why the production of books, papers, records, and other data demanded in the subject IRS summons should not be compelled: Date: May 25, 2021, Time: 10:00 a.m., Courtroom: 6A, Address: Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California, 92701. (see document for further details) (hr)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REFERRAL OF MATTER to the Magistrate Judge. Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is referred to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for determination. (twdb)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angela Gill counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Angela Gill as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Angela Gill added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Gill, Angela)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Tanner, Jolene)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration in Support Thereof No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Claudia Garcia and Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order to show Cause) (Attorney Jolene Tanner added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Tanner, Jolene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Kathleen A. Reffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen A. Reffert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jolene Tanner
Represented By: Angela Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?