Ralph Kuhen v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Kuhen, CPA on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as R. Kuhen & Co Inc.
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd and The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc
Case Number: 8:2021cv00773
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 45 Text Only ORDER GRANTING Application of Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin R. Tharp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd #43 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 3, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 13) filed by Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. (Anscombe, Anthony)
June 1, 2021 Filing 43 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin R. Tharp to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31387002) filed by Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ayerh, Melanie)
May 19, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in support of its Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Iverson, Kelly)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING on (1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint (Doc. #13 ) and (2) Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss Amended Nationwide Class Action Claims (Doc. #14 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Prior to the transfer, Defendant filed two motions, which have been fully brief (1) a Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Class Action Complaint (Doc. 13); and (2) a Motion to Dismiss for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss Amended Nationwide Class Claims (Doc. 14). The Court sets both motions for hearing on 10/15/2021 at 10:30 AM., which is the next available date on the Courts calendar. SeeJudges Procedures Page, https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-josephine-l-staton. (jp)
May 6, 2021 Filing 40 Text Only ORDER GRANTING 1) Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kelly K. Iverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA #37 , 2) Application of Non-Resident Attorney Gary F. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA #36 , and 3) Application of Non-Resident Attorney Sarah D. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd #38 pursuant to the Courts directive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 5, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #35 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 4, 2021 Filing 38 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Sarah D. Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31235431) filed by Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ayerh, Melanie)
May 4, 2021 Filing 37 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kelly K. Iverson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31234384) filed by Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kim, Jae)
May 4, 2021 Filing 36 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary F. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31234252) filed by Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kim, Jae)
May 4, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jae Kook Kim on behalf of Plaintiff Ralph Kuhen, CPA (Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Ralph Kuhen, CPA(pty:pla))(Kim, Jae)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
April 28, 2021 Filing 33 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
April 27, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Sarah D Gordon on behalf on Defendant. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
April 27, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 27, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
April 27, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:20-cv-01669-JCH, from Southern District of California (San Diego). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 8:21-cv-00773 JLS (ADSx). (ghap)
April 27, 2021 Filing 28 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred to District of Central District of California-Southern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California-Southern Division*.*411 West Fourth Street, Room 1053**Santa Ana, CA 92701*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ralph Kuhen, CPA re #24 Order to Show Cause. (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE re #24 Order to Show Cause filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Anscombe, Anthony) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not Be Transferred to the Central District of California. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 12/18/2020.(anh) Modified on 12/18/2020 (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE re: Second Notice of Supplemental Authority by Ralph Kuhen, CPA re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd D. Carpenter)(Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Ralph Kuhen, CPA re #18 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd D. Carpenter)(Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proof of Service)(Anscombe, Anthony) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
December 7, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Amended Nationwide Class Claims filed by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Anscombe, Anthony) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Amended Nationwide Class Claims filed by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint filed by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd D. Carpenter)(Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #13 and Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Amended Nationwide Class Claims #14 [ECF. No. #16 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/9/2020. (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
November 9, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Continue Briefing Deadlines for Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Amended Nationwide Class Claims by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Amended Nationwide Class Claims by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Proof of Service)(Anscombe, Anthony) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Anthony J. Anscombe, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Proof of Service)(Anscombe, Anthony) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Minute Order: In light of Plaintiffs amended complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss [Doc. No. #6 ] and motion for leave to file motion to dismiss nationwide class claims [Doc. No. #8 ] are DENIED AS MOOT. It is SO ORDERED. (anh) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd, filed by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Sarah Gordon, re #9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/23/2020.(rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14561112.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gordon, Sarah) (rmc). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Nationwide Class Claims by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Memo of Points and Authorities, #3 Proof of Service)(Anscombe, Anthony) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.. (Anscombe, Anthony) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Anthony Anscombe, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Proof of Service)(Anscombe, Anthony)Attorney Anthony John Anscombe added to party Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd(pty:dft) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ralph Kuhen, CPA as to Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. Only (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd served. (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. served. (Carpenter, Todd) (anh). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14399186.), filed by Ralph Kuhen, CPA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1669-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Carpenter, Todd)(jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 4/27/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ralph Kuhen v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Kuhen, CPA on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as R. Kuhen & Co Inc.
Represented By: Todd D Carpenter
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Kelly K. Iverson
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd
Represented By: Anthony J Anscombe
Represented By: Sarah D. Gordon
Represented By: Melanie Atswei Ayerh
Represented By: Caitlin R. Tharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?