Dale J. Giali v. ULRS, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dale J. Giali
Defendant: TITANIUM ALARM, LLC, ULRS, INC. dba UNITED LEGAL GROUP, ULRS, Inc. doing business as United Legal Group and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 8:2021cv01075
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL CASE by Judge David O. Carter: The Court, having been notified by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled re Notice of Settlement #11 , hereby orders this action DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court hereby orders ALL proceedings in the case VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court retains jurisdiction for 30 days to vacate this order and reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been consummated. The Clerk shall serve this minute order on the parties. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
July 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Titanium Alarm, LLC. (Hexom, Mandy)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (kd)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
June 22, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant ULRS, INC. dba UNITED LEGAL GROUP.(Coleman, June)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Mandy D Hexom on behalf of Defendant TITANIUM ALARM, LLC (Hexom, Mandy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney June D Coleman on behalf of Defendant ULRS, INC. dba UNITED LEGAL GROUP (Coleman, June)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TITANIUM ALARM, LLC, identifying Titanium, LLC. (Attorney Mandy D Hexom added to party TITANIUM ALARM, LLC(pty:dft))(Hexom, Mandy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 JOINDER filed by Defendant TITANIUM ALARM, LLC joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Hexom, Mandy)
June 18, 2021 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Titanium Alarm, LLC, ULRS, Inc., Does 1 through 10. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Dale J. Giali. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant ULRS, INC. dba UNITED LEGAL GROUP. (Coleman, June)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Orange, case number 30- 2021-01200562-CU-BT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31490906 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant ULRS, INC. dba UNITED LEGAL GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - ULRS Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Case Management Conference) (Attorney June D Coleman added to party ULRS, INC. dba UNITED LEGAL GROUP(pty:dft))(Coleman, June)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale J. Giali v. ULRS, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale J. Giali
Represented By: Dale J. Giali
Represented By: Keri E Borders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TITANIUM ALARM, LLC
Represented By: Mandy D Hexom
Represented By: Matthew Steven Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULRS, INC. dba UNITED LEGAL GROUP
Represented By: June D Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ULRS, Inc. doing business as United Legal Group
Represented By: June D Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?