James F. Keith v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: James F Keith and James F. Keith
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 8:2021cv01153
Filed: July 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 8:21-cv-01153 AGR on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) - Non-Final #12 , Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) - Non-Final #10 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Stacy Wiesbrock added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Wiesbrock, Stacy)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James F. Keith, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 7/14/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Flabia De La Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. (Panutich, Alex)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff James F. Keith. (Panutich, Alex)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. THE COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER HAS BEEN REVISED EFFECTIVE JANUARY 2016. PLEASE REVIEW THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. In accordance with General Order 05-01, this case is designated for electronic filing. A chambers copy is required only for the joint stipulation and the certified administrative record. In order to facilitate the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this case, the parties shall comply with the following instructions: (see document for further details). (hr)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (hr)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by PLAINTIFF James F Keith. (Panutich, Alex)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF James F Keith, (Panutich, Alex)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by PLAINTIFF James F Keith. (Panutich, Alex)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James F Keith. (Panutich, Alex)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by PLAINTIFF James F Keith. (Attorney Alex Panutich added to party James F Keith(pty:pla))(Panutich, Alex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James F. Keith v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Stacy Wiesbrock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F Keith
Represented By: Alex Panutich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James F. Keith
Represented By: Alex Panutich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?