DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC et al v. FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC et al
Plaintiff: DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC and MADELEINE TASHJIAN
Defendant: FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC, CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01232
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MADELEINE TASHJIAN. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Shapero, Sarah)
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #8 . Plaintiff counsel is ordered to file a CORRECTED Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with the correct case number listed. Deadline is July 30, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
July 21, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kd)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MADELEINE TASHJIAN. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Shapero, Sarah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MADELEINE TASHJIAN, FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC, CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS. (Shapero, Sarah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
July 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
July 19, 2021 Filing 3 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE TRUSTEES SALE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JULY 21, 2021 at 10:00 am filed by plaintiff DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MADELEINE TASHJIAN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF SARAH SHAPERO IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, #2 Declaration OF VAHE TASHJIAN IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE TRUSTEES SALE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JULY 21, 2021 at 10:00 am, #3 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER TO RESTRAIN THE TRUSTEES SALE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JULY 21, 2021 at 10:00 am, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Shapero added to party MADELEINE TASHJIAN(pty:pla)) (Shapero, Sarah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC, MADELEINE TASHJIAN. (Shapero, Sarah)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31653414 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC. (Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Shapero added to party DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC(pty:pla))(Shapero, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC et al v. FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUTCHINTS DEVELOPMENT, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADELEINE TASHJIAN
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Shapero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?