Alessandro Pirozzi v. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development Washington D.C. et al
Plaintiff: Alessandro Pirozzi
Defendant: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development Washington D.C. and Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01288
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. On 9/14/2021, Plaintiff filed a proof of service ("POS") declaration that does not reflect service as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i). On or before 9/30/21, Plaintiff shall file an amended POS or a status report explaining why Plaintiff believes that the service efforts described in the initial POS are sufficient to serve a federal agency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jdo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 14, 2021 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Teri Gallagher Re Service re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #6 filed by Plaintiff Alessandro Pirozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ramos, James)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT of Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Alessandro Pirozzi re: Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 . (Ramos, James)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Recordation of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens) filed by Plaintiff Alessandro Pirozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ramos, James)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of Electronic Filing re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #6 , Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form #5 e-mailed to Paige Hopkins Gosney at page.gosney@greshamsavage.com bounced due to Typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to paige.gosney@greshamsavage.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Secretary of Housing and Urban Development Washington D.C. (esa)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alessandro Pirozzi. (Ramos, James)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alessandro Pirozzi, (Ramos, James)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alessandro Pirozzi. (Ramos, James)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31723510 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Alessandro Pirozzi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney James J Ramos added to party Alessandro Pirozzi(pty:pla))(Ramos, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alessandro Pirozzi v. Secretary of Housing and Urban Development Washington D.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alessandro Pirozzi
Represented By: James J Ramos
Represented By: Paige Hopkins Gosney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of Housing and Urban Development Washington D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?