Yvonne Roa v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: YVONNE ROA
Defendant: FCA US LLC, TUTTLE-CLICK'S TUSTIN CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE, Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Tuttle-Click Inc. doing business as Tuttle-Click's Tustin Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Case Number: 8:2021cv01318
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the Court ENTERS JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 #46 . (jp)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) (Dolin, Tionna)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Plaintiff YVONNE ROA (Plaintiff) accepted Defendants FCA US, LLC's Offer of Judgment Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 68 on 5/16/2022 (Doc. #42 ). Accordingly, the Court enters JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Notice of Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)(Rabieian, Debora)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: REQUEST to Withdraw Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) #42 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): No [Prop] Judgment is attached. Please submit a [Prop] Judgment before the Judge. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 [Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed as] REQUEST to Withdraw Request for Entry of Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Dolin, Tionna) Modified on 1/24/2023 (lom).
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Dolin, Tionna)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings (Doc. #26 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (See document for further information). (jp)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleading (Doc. #26 ) and Taking Matter Under Submission by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the matter is taken under submission, and the hearing set for 5/6/2022, at 10:30 am is VACATED. (jp)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING Motion to Remand (Doc. #24 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Defendant has met its burden in showing that the amount-in-controversy exceeds $75,000 by a preponderance of the evidence. For the above reasons, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. (See document for further information). (jp)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Yvonne Roa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Yvonne Roa(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to FRCP Rule 12(c) #26 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 RFJN iso Reply, #2 Exhibit A to RFJN, #3 Exhibit B to RFJN, #4 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Opposition In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to FRCP Rule 12(c) #26 filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Kuemerle, Karin)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER: VACATING Hearing on Motion to Remand (Doc. #24 ) Taking Matter UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the matter is taken under submission, and the hearing set for 4/15/2022, at 10:30 AM., is VACATED. (jp)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Opposition in opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #24 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Attorney iso Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Atty Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ADVANCES the hearing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #26 currently set for May 20, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. to May 6, 2022 at 10:30 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Josephine L. Staton - Effective Monday, March 21, 2022, Judge Josephine L. Staton will be located in the First Street U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom 8A, on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8A of the First Street U.S. Courthouse unless otherwise ordered by the Court. For additional information regarding mandatory chambers copies and the use of Zoom hearings in civil matters, please refer to Judge Staton's Procedures & Schedules Page on the Court's website: https://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-josephine-l-staton. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULEREGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (Doc.24) by Judge Josephine L. Staton. On November 3, 2021, Plaintiff Yvonne Roa file a Motion to Remand. (Doc. #24 .) Defendant FCA US LLC is hereby ordered to file its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order. Plaintiff may then file a reply within seven (7) days of the date of Defendants response. Upon conclusion of the briefing schedule, the Court will take the matter under submission unless otherwise noted. (lom)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karin Kuemerle counsel for Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. Adding Karin Kuemerle as counsel of record for Yvonne Roa for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Yvonne Roa(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #26 currently set for May 13, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. to May 20, 2022 at 10:30 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to FRCP Rule 12(c) filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/13/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities iso MJOP, #2 Declaration of Atty iso MJOP, #3 Exhibit A to Atty Decl, #4 Exhibit B to Atty Decl, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service) (Azemoon, Ali)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange #24 filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (Law, Daniel)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Remand) (Law, Daniel)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 23, 2022. (mku)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES (In Chambers) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing 10/1/2021, is VACATED and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 11/30/2021. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 6/3/2022. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 6/17/2022. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 6/17/2022. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 7/15/2022. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 8/12/2022. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 12/23/2022. Last Day to File Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions: 1/27/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2023 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa, (Law, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates)(Law, Daniel)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiff Yvonne Roa. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiff YVONNE ROA for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff YVONNE ROA. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Yvonne Roa(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #10 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #9 , Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #12 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #11 served on 8/11/2021. (Rogerson, Hailey)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01318-JLS(ADSx). (eva)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa, upon Defendant Tuttle-Click's Tustin Chrysler Jeep Dodge served on 3/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Karen Depuy, Office Manager, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 3/11/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 12) (esa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Yvonne Roa, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 3/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. )filed in state court 3/11/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 11) (esa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant FCA US LLC. (filed in state court 3/30/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 13) (esa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, FCA US LLC, Tuttle-Click's Tustin Chrysler Jeep Dodge, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Yvonne Roa. (filed in state court 2/1/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Tuttle-Click Inc. (filed in state court 3/30/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 14)(esa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Yvonne Roa as to Tuttle-Click Inc. (filed in state court 7/8/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 4) (esa)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Gruzman, Greg)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01182197-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31769553 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hugret iso Removal, #2 Declaration of Hailey Rogerson iso Removal, #3 Exhibit A to HR Declaration iso Removal, #4 Exhibit B to HR Declaration iso Removal, #5 Exhibit C to HR Declaration iso Removal, #6 Exhibit D to HR Declaration iso Removal, #7 Exhibit E to HR Declaration iso Removal, #8 Exhibit F to HR Declaration iso Removal, #9 Exhibit G to HR Declaration iso Removal, #10 Exhibit H to HR Declaration iso Removal, #11 Exhibit I to HR Declaration iso Removal, #12 Exhibit J to HR Declaration iso Removal, #13 Exhibit K to HR Declaration iso Removal, #14 Exhibit L to HR Declaration iso Removal, #15 Exhibit M to HR Declaration iso Removal, #16 Exhibit N to HR Declaration iso Removal, #17 Exhibit O to HR Declaration iso Removal, #18 Exhibit P to HR Declaration iso Removal, #19 Exhibit Q to HR Declaration iso Removal, #20 Exhibit R to HR Declaration iso Removal, #21 Exhibit S to HR Declaration iso Removal, #22 Exhibit T to HR Declaration iso Removal, #23 Exhibit U to HR Declaration iso Removal, #24 Exhibit V to HR Declaration iso Removal, #25 Exhibit W to HR Declaration iso Removal, #26 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yvonne Roa v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVONNE ROA
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUTTLE-CLICK'S TUSTIN CHRYSLER JEEP DODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuttle-Click Inc. doing business as Tuttle-Click's Tustin Chrysler Jeep Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?