Bonnie Vicari v. MCC and Co., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bonnie Vicari
Defendant: MCC and Co., Inc. and DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01357
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 14 CIVIL TRIAL ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton. (mku)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than December 30, 2022. (mku)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for hearing and the following schedule is set. Last Day to File a Motion to Add Parties or Amend Pleadings: 12/7/2021. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 6/10/2022. Last Day to File Motions (Excluding Daubert Motions and all other Motions in Limine): 6/24/2022. Last Day to Serve Initial Expert Reports: 6/24/2022. Last Day to Serve Rebuttal Expert Reports: 7/22/2022. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 8/19/2022. Last Day to Conduct Settlement Proceedings: 12/30/2022. Last Day to File Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions: 2/3/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2023 at 10:30 AM. (See document for further information). (jp)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendant MCC and Co., Inc... (Kun, Michael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
August 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE to Plaintiff Bonnie Vicari regarding Consent to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant MCC and Co., Inc.. (Kun, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant MCC and Co., Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on August 17, 2021. (Kun, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MCC and Co., Inc., (Kun, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant MCC and Co., Inc.. (Kun, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01197478-CU-WT-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-31824480 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant MCC and Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Amy Forte in Support of Defendant McCormick & Company, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Michael S Kun added to party MCC and Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(Kun, Michael)
August 17, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Bonnie Vicari in Orange County Superior on 4/23/2021, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
August 17, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant MCC and Co., Inc. in Orange County Superior Court on 8/16/2021, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonnie Vicari v. MCC and Co., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Vicari
Represented By: Heidi L DeGroot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCC and Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael S Kun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?