C.H. Belt and Associates, Inc. v. Americold Logistics LLC
Plaintiff: C.H. Belt and Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Americold Logistics LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv01439
Filed: September 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Americold Logistics LLC, (Green, Ian)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (es)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Americold Logistics LLC.(Attorney Ian M Green added to party Americold Logistics LLC(pty:dft))(Green, Ian)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Americold Logistics LLC. (lh)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff C.H. Belt & Associates, Inc.. (Botta, Bartholomew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 **DUPLICATE** NOTICE of Interested Parties filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff C.H. Belt & Associates, Inc.. (Botta, Bartholomew) Modified on 9/2/2021 (lh).
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff C.H. Belt & Associates, Inc., (Botta, Bartholomew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff C.H. Belt & Associates, Inc.. (Botta, Bartholomew)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31921051 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff C.H. Belt & Associates, Inc.. (Attorney Bartholomew M Botta added to party C.H. Belt & Associates, Inc.(pty:pla))(Botta, Bartholomew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.H. Belt and Associates, Inc. v. Americold Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.H. Belt and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Bartholomew M Botta
Represented By: June T Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americold Logistics LLC
Represented By: Ian M Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?