Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, et al v. California Department of Social Services, et al
Plaintiff: Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Adeona Health Care, LLC and Tonmoy Sharma
Defendant: California Department of Social Services and Gregory Rose
Case Number: 8:2021cv01488
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Final Adjudication of Related State Court Writ Proceeding filed by Plaintiffs Adeona Health Care, LLC, Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Tonmoy Sharma.(Baughman, Krista)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE #15 by Judge Josephine L. Staton, the following: Defendants' responsive pleading deadline and the briefing schedule for the Defendants' anticipated motions in response to the Complaint shall be as follows: Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline: 11/10/2021; Plaintiffs Response/Opposition to Defendants' Anticipated Motions in Response to Complaint: 12/22/2021; Defendants' Reply in support of Anticipated Motions in Response to Complaint 1/19/2022. (jp)
October 8, 2021 Filing 15 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants California Department of Social Services, Gregory Rose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gill, Kirin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 14 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kirin K Gill on behalf of Defendants California Department of Social Services, Gregory Rose (Attorney Kirin K Gill added to party California Department of Social Services(pty:dft), Attorney Kirin K Gill added to party Gregory Rose(pty:dft))(Gill, Kirin)
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.. upon Gregory Rose waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/7/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kirin K. Gill. (Baughman, Krista)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Adeona Health Care, LLC, Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc., Tonmoy Sharma, (Baughman, Krista)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (eva)
September 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Gregory Rose. (esa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant California Department of Social Services. (esa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (esa)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTH CARE, LLC, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California Corporation, TONMOY SHARMA. (Baughman, Krista)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTH CARE, LLC, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California Corporation, TONMOY SHARMA. (Baughman, Krista)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ADEONA HEALTH CARE, LLC, DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California Corporation, TONMOY SHARMA. (Baughman, Krista)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31961752 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California Corporation, TONMOY SHARMA, ADEONA HEALTH CARE, LLC. (Attorney Krista L Baughman added to party ADEONA HEALTH CARE, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Krista L Baughman added to party DUAL DIAGNOSIS TREATMENT CENTER, INC., a California Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Krista L Baughman added to party TONMOY SHARMA(pty:pla))(Baughman, Krista)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, et al v. California Department of Social Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.
Represented By: Karin Moore Sweigart
Represented By: Krista L Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeona Health Care, LLC
Represented By: Karin Moore Sweigart
Represented By: Krista L Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonmoy Sharma
Represented By: Karin Moore Sweigart
Represented By: Krista L Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Social Services
Represented By: Kirin K Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Rose
Represented By: Kirin K Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?