Manuel Nunez v. Ford Motor Company et al
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Petitioner: Ford Motor Company and Manuel Nunez
Case Number: 8:2021cv01550
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 First STIPULATION for Settlement Joint Stipulation re Request for Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Manuel Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Jeeho)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation for Settlement #10 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 First STIPULATION for Settlement Joint Statement re Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Manuel Nunez Manuel Nunez.(Lim, Jeeho)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, served on September 21, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Action to Federal Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Electronic Service Email of Notice)(Sanders, Justin)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on December 2, 2021. (rrp)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:21-cv-01550-CJC-(JDEx). (dve)
September 21, 2021 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
September 20, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Manuel Nunez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/11/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
September 20, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Sanders, Justin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Ford Motor Company. (Sanders, Justin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01215083-CU-BC-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-32015681 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration Of Sabrina Narain In Support Of Defendant Ford Motor Companys Notice Of Removal Of Action, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- State Court Answer) (Attorney Justin H Sanders added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:bkmov))(Sanders, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manuel Nunez v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Justin H Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?