Banzai Surf Company, LLC v. Amplify Energy Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC, Endless Sun Surf School, Clint Carroll Surf School, Learn to Surf LLC, Goff Tours, Zack's By The Beach, Ziggy's On Main, Bob's Lemonade, Main St. Eyewear and Boutique, Coach's Mediterranean Grill and Bar and Cold Stone Creamery
Defendant: AMPLIFY ENERGY CORPORATION,, BETA OPERATION COMPANY LLC, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Amplify Energy Corporation and Beta Operation Company LLC doing business as Beta Offshore, a Texas Corporation
Case Number: 8:2021cv01669
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 28 days, filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operation Company LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Request: ADR Procedure Selection)(Keegan, Christopher)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CASE SCHEDULING #23 by Judge David O. Carter. In the event the Court consolidates some or all of the related cases, Plaintiffs in the putative class action cases shall file a consolidated amended complaint or complaints no later than 30 days after the appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. (See document for further details). (jp)
November 23, 2021 Filing 24 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company answer now due 12/23/2021; Beta Operation Company LLC answer now due 12/23/2021; Amplify Energy Corporation answer now due 12/23/2021, re Amended Complaint/Petition #21 filed by Defendants San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company; Beta Operation Company LLC; Amplify Energy Corporation.(Keegan, Christopher)
November 22, 2021 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 60 days after consolidated amended complaint or complaints filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operation Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
November 12, 2021 Filing 22 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter: Given the Courts Order setting a Scheduling Conference in these related actions #20 , the Motion to Consolidate #15 is DENIED AS MOOT and the hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 is accordingly VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 9, 2021 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operation Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by PLAINTIFF Banzai Surf Company, LLC(Weil, Kelly)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 19 JOINT MOTION FOR RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operation Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company (Keegan, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operation Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, identifying Banzai Surf Company; Amplify Energy Corp.; Beta Operating Company, LLC; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company Amplify Energy Operating LLC; Amplify Acquisitionco LLC; Amplify Energy Holdings, LLC; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; HCC International Insurance Co. PLC; Lloyds Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1036 (QBE Underwriting Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1084 (Chaucer Insurance Company); Lloyds Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting); Lloyds Syndicate 1221 (Hartford Insurance Group); Lloyds Syndicate 1225 (Aegis London); Lloyds Syndicate 1274 (Antares Managing Agency Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 3000 (Markel International Insurance Company Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Limited); Markel International Insurance Company Limited; Markel International Insurance Company Limited. (Keegan, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher William Keegan counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operation Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. Adding Christopher W. Keegan as counsel of record for Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party Amplify Energy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party Beta Operation Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company(pty:dft))(Keegan, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
October 28, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases, as to 8:21-CV-01669; 8:21-cv-01694; 8:21-cv-01725; and 8:21-cv-01738,, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by PLAINTIFF Banzai Surf Company, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gary A. Praglin, #2 Declaration of Kelly Weil, #3 Declaration of Wylie A. Aitken, #4 Declaration of Darren O. Aitken, #5 Declaration of Megan G. Demshki, #6 Declaration of Gregory L. Bentley, #7 Declaration of Clare H. Lucich, #8 Declaration of Matthew W. Clark, #9 Declaration of Francis A. Bottini, Jr., #10 Declaration of Paul Matiasic, #11 Proposed Order) (Weil, Kelly)
October 25, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC, upon Defendant San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lya Daggett, Authorized to Accept at COGENCY GLOBAL INC., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Weil, Kelly)
October 25, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC, upon Defendant Beta Operation Company LLC served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lya Daggett, Authorized to Accept at COGENCY GLOBAL INC., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Weil, Kelly)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Banzai Surf Company, LLC, upon Defendant Amplify Energy Corporation served on 10/19/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lya Daggett, Authorized to Accept at COGENCY GLOBAL INC., Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Weil, Kelly)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (ts)
October 8, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (car)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Beta Operation Company LLC. (car)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amplify Energy Corporation. (car)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC, identifying BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC. (Weil, Kelly)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC. (Weil, Kelly)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by PLAINTIFF BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Weil, Kelly)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32116842 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC. (Attorney Kelly Christina Weil added to party BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC(pty:pla))(Weil, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banzai Surf Company, LLC v. Amplify Energy Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BANZAI SURF COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Kelly Christina Weil
Represented By: Anne Marie Murphy
Represented By: Gary A Praglin
Represented By: Hannah Brown
Represented By: Robert B Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endless Sun Surf School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Carroll Surf School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Learn to Surf LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goff Tours
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zack's By The Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ziggy's On Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bob's Lemonade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Main St. Eyewear and Boutique
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach's Mediterranean Grill and Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cold Stone Creamery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMPLIFY ENERGY CORPORATION,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETA OPERATION COMPANY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amplify Energy Corporation
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beta Operation Company LLC doing business as Beta Offshore, a Texas Corporation
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?