Quality Sea Food, Inc. et al v. Amplify Energy Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Quality Sea Food, Inc., Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc. and Steve Legere
Defendant: Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company LLC dba Beta Offshore, SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY, Beta Operating Company LLC doing business as Beta Offshore and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2021cv01680
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 28 days, filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company.. (Attachments: #1 Request: ADR Procedure Selection)(Keegan, Christopher)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter, Granting Joint Stipulation Regarding Case Scheduling #20 . (twdb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 20 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 60 days after consolidated amended complaint or complaints are filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Keegan, Christopher)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge David O. Carter: ORDER RE: INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. ( Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge David O. Carter.) (twdb)
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, Beta Operating Company LLC, Amplify Energy Corporation.(Keegan, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 JOINT MOTION FOR RULE 16(b) CONFERENCE filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company (Keegan, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company, identifying Quality Sea Food, Inc. Jack Buttler; LBC Seafood, Inc.; Steve Legere; Amplify Energy Corp.; Beta Operating Company, LLC; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company; Amplify Energy Operating LLC; Amplify Acquisitionco LLC; Amplify Energy Holdings, LLC; Ascot Underwriting Inc.; HCC International Insurance Co. PLC; Lloyds Syndicate 0457 (Munich Re Syndicate Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1036 (QBE Underwriting Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1084 (Chaucer Insurance Company); Lloyds Syndicate 1183 (Talbot Underwriting); Lloyds Syndicate 1221 (Hartford Insurance Group); Lloyds Syndicate 1225 (Aegis London); Lloyds Syndicate 1274 (Antares Managing Agency Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 1686 (Axis Corporate Capital UK Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 3000 (Markel International Insurance Company Limited); Lloyds Syndicate 5000 (Travelers Syndicate Management Limited); Markel International Insurance Company Limited; Markel International Insurance Company Limited. (Keegan, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher William Keegan counsel for Defendants Amplify Energy Corporation, Beta Operating Company LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. Adding Christopher W. Keegan as counsel of record for Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Amplify Energy Corp., Beta Operating Company, LLC, San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party Amplify Energy Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party Beta Operating Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher William Keegan added to party San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company(pty:dft))(Keegan, Christopher)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (ts)
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Steve Legere, Jack Buttler, Quality Sea Food, Inc., LBC Seafood, Inc., upon Defendant Amplify Energy Corporation served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021; Beta Operating Company LLC served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021; San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Beta Operating POS for Summons, #2 San Pedro Bay Pipeline POS for Summons)(Maclear, Matthew)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:21-cv-01628 DOC(JDEx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick and Judge James V. Selna to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-01680 DOC(JDEx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Beta Operating Company LLC. (et)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant San Pedro Bay Pipeline Company. (et)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Amplify Energy Corporation. (et)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Maclear, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Quality Sea Food, Inc., Steve Legere. (Attachments: #1 Beta Operating, #2 San Pedro Bay Pipeline)(Maclear, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jack Buttler, LBC Seafood, Inc., Quality Sea Food, Inc., Steve Legere. (Maclear, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: BCACDC-32128655 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Steve Legere, Jack Buttler, Quality Sea Food, Inc., LBC Seafood, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party Jack Buttler(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party LBC Seafood, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party Quality Sea Food, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Christopher Maclear added to party Steve Legere(pty:pla))(Maclear, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality Sea Food, Inc. et al v. Amplify Energy Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Sea Food, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Maclear
Represented By: Erica A Maharg
Represented By: James Thomas Brett
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Represented By: Paul A Matiasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Buttler
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Maclear
Represented By: Erica A Maharg
Represented By: James Thomas Brett
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Represented By: Paul A Matiasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LBC Seafood, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Maclear
Represented By: Erica A Maharg
Represented By: James Thomas Brett
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Represented By: Paul A Matiasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Legere
Represented By: Matthew Christopher Maclear
Represented By: Erica A Maharg
Represented By: James Thomas Brett
Represented By: Jason Robert Flanders
Represented By: Paul A Matiasic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amplify Energy Corporation
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beta Operating Company LLC dba Beta Offshore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN PEDRO BAY PIPELINE COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beta Operating Company LLC doing business as Beta Offshore
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?