Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. El Gaucho, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: El Gaucho, Inc. an unknown business entity d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino, Carlos Rafael Patti individually and d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino, Giancarlo Patti individually and d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino, El Gaucho, Inc. an unknown business entity doing business as Puerto Madero Mercado Latino, Carlos Rafael Patti individually doing business as Puerto Madero Mercado Latino and Giancarlo Patti individually and d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino doing business as Puerto Madero Mercado Latino
Case Number: 8:2021cv01862
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Terry J Hatter
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc., upon Defendant Giancarlo Patti served on 12/13/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Riley, Thomas)
November 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued #13 . Document 13 is a duplicate summons issued as to El Gaucho Inc. that was issued in error. The operative summons is docket entry 12. Docket 13 is withdrawn. (shb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Giancarlo Patti. (shb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Carlos Rafael Patti. (shb)
November 23, 2021 Filing 13 [WITHDRAWN PER , #16 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, 11/23/2021] - 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant El Gaucho, Inc.. (shb) Modified on 11/23/2021 (shb).
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant El Gaucho, Inc.. (shb)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder, Chair of the Case Management and Assignment Committee: Pursuant to General Order 21-01, Innovative Sports Management, Inc. cases have been assigned to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that are or may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Related Group Control Number is CV 11-07395-TJH(PLAx). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jtil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (jtil) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 15, 2021 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
November 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil)
November 11, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, (Riley, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Riley, Thomas)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32311359 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attorney Thomas P Riley added to party Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media(pty:pla))(Riley, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. El Gaucho, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. doing business as Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Gaucho, Inc. an unknown business entity d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Rafael Patti individually and d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giancarlo Patti individually and d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Gaucho, Inc. an unknown business entity doing business as Puerto Madero Mercado Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Rafael Patti individually doing business as Puerto Madero Mercado Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giancarlo Patti individually and d/b/a Puerto Madero Mercado Latino doing business as Puerto Madero Mercado Latino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?