Zachary Castaneda v. Santa Ana Police Department Staff et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Castaneda
Defendant: Santa Ana Police Department Staff and Orange County Global Medical Center Staff
Case Number: 8:2021cv02042
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO AMEND RELIEF REQUESTED IN COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's motion to amend the request for relief is DENIED. (iv)
January 21, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO AMEND RELIEF REQUESTED IN COMPLAINT #1 filed by Plaintiff Zachary Castaneda. (kl)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: DENIED, and this case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv)
January 12, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Zachary Castaneda. (hr)
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Zachary Castaneda. (hr)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Zachary Castaneda. (hr)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Zachary Castaneda. (jtil)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Zachary Castaneda. (jtil)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Zachary Castaneda against Defendants Orange County Global Medical Center Staff, Santa Ana Police Department Staff pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zachary Castaneda v. Santa Ana Police Department Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Castaneda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Ana Police Department Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Global Medical Center Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?