Judith Rodriguez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Judith Rodriguez
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 8:2021cv02056
Filed: December 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. Please use the case number SACV21-2056 KK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Judith Rodriguez. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
January 14, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Judith Rodriguez, upon Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi served on 12/27/2021, answer due 3/28/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Office of Regional Counsel,. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
January 5, 2022 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Jennifer Lee Tarn added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Tarn, Jennifer)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (see document for details) (hr)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (hr)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
December 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Judith Rodriguez, (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
December 15, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Judith Rodriguez. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
December 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Judith Rodriguez. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
December 15, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Judith Rodriguez. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
December 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Judith Rodriguez. (Attorney Lawrence D Rohlfing added to party Judith Rodriguez(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judith Rodriguez v. Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Rodriguez
Represented By: Lawrence D Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney SA-CV
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Tarn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?