Dale n. Strieter v. Patriot Environmental Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Strieter N Dale and Dale N. Strieter
Defendant: Patriot Environmental Services Inc Patriot Environmental Services Inc, San Martin Susan, Does 1 through 10, inclusive,, Patriot Environmental Services, Inc. and Susan San Martin
Case Number: 8:2021cv02111
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by STRIETER Dale N. Strieter. upon Susan San Martin waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Waiver of Service signed by MELISSA D. HILL. (Silver, Gregory)
January 19, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by STRIETER Dale N. Strieter. upon Patriot Environmental Services, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 1/12/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. Waiver of Service signed by MELISSA D. HILL. (Silver, Gregory)
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-02111 JLS(DFMx). (rn)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Patriot Environmental Services, Inc., Susan San Martin. (lh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Dale Strieter Strieter N Dale. (Silver, Gregory)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DALE STRIETER Strieter N Dale, (Silver, Gregory)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strieter N Dale. (Silver, Gregory)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32528268 - Fee: $402, filed by Dale Strieter Strieter N Dale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit exhibit a) (Attorney Gregory S Silver added to party Strieter N Dale(pty:pla))(Silver, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dale n. Strieter v. Patriot Environmental Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strieter N Dale
Represented By: Gregory S Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale N. Strieter
Represented By: Gregory S Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Environmental Services Inc Patriot Environmental Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Martin Susan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Environmental Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan San Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?