Zhuang Li et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Zhuang Li, New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc and New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc.
Defendant: USCIS, Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas, Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Alejandro Mayorkas and Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 8:2022cv00064
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zhuang Li, New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc., upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Ealy Lase. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Ealy Lase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to C. Veloz. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment #1, #2 Exhibit Attachment #2)(Shu, Han)
February 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Please refer to the Order for complete details. IT IS SO ORDERED. (kd)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-010) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong, this case is transferred from Judge Cormac J. Carney to the calendar of Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-00064-MEMF-ADS. (sn)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge James V. Selna. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:22-cv-00064-CJC-(ADSx). (dve)
January 18, 2022 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (ghap)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Zhuang Li, New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc, (Shu, Han)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Zhuang Li, New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment #1, #2 Exhibit Attachment #2)(Shu, Han)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Zhuang Li, New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc. (Shu, Han)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32624712 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Zhuang Li, New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A of the Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B of the Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C of the Complaint) (Attorney Han Shu added to party Zhuang Li (pty:pla), Attorney Han Shu added to party New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc(pty:pla))(Shu, Han)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhuang Li et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhuang Li
Represented By: Han Shu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New High-Tech Enterprise Company Inc.
Represented By: Han Shu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?