1570 Fair Oaks LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: 1570 Fair Oaks LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 8:2022cv00846
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7426 IRS: Wrongful Levy for Taxes
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 1570 Fair Oaks LLC answer now due 8/1/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Attorney Angela Gill added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Gill, Angela)
April 22, 2022 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (car)
April 22, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff 1570 Fair Oaks LLC. (Shaff, Michael)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff 1570 Fair Oaks LLC, identifying 1570 Fair Oaks LLC, a California limited liability company. (Shaff, Michael)
April 21, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff 1570 Fair Oaks LLC. (Shaff, Michael)
April 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33167228 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff 1570 Fair Oaks LLC. (Attorney Michael E. Shaff added to party 1570 Fair Oaks LLC(pty:pla))(Shaff, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1570 Fair Oaks LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1570 Fair Oaks LLC
Represented By: Michael E. Shaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Angela Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?