Securities and Exchange Commission v. TKO Farms Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: TKO Farms Inc., Agravitae Inc., Kenneth Dewayne Owen, Reynaldo Aguilar, Jr, James Brian Blaylock, Ross Gregory Erskine, The Estate of Gilbert Allan Penhollow, Freelife Logistics LLC, Personal Group LLC, Signature One Capital Inc. and Storber LLC
Case Number: 8:2022cv00941
Filed: May 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Storber LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Corbett H. Williams, attorney for Defendant Storber LLC. (Combs, Tracy)
June 17, 2022 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Reynaldo Aguilar, Jr waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Corbett H. Williams, attorney for Defendant Reynaldo Aguilar Jr. (Combs, Tracy)
June 8, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant Freelife Logistics LLC served on 5/25/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Brian Blaylock, Manager/Agent of Freelife Logistics LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Combs, Tracy)
June 8, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, upon Defendant James Brian Blaylock served on 5/25/2022, answer due 6/15/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon James Brian Blaylock in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Combs, Tracy)
June 7, 2022 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Agravitae Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Tom A. Brady, attorney for Agravitae Inc. (Combs, Tracy)
June 7, 2022 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon TKO Farms Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Tom A. Brady, attorney for TKO Farms Inc.. (Combs, Tracy)
June 7, 2022 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Kenneth Dewayne Owen waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Tom A. Brady, attorney for Kenneth D. Owen. (Combs, Tracy)
May 20, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Signature One Capital Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas L. Gourde, counsel for defendant. (Combs, Tracy)
May 20, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Personal Group LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas L. Gourde, counsel for defendant. (Combs, Tracy)
May 20, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon Ross Gregory Erskine waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/17/2022, answer due 7/18/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Thomas L. Gourde, counsel for defendant. (Combs, Tracy)
May 17, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. upon The Estate of Gilbert Allan Penhollow waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/11/2022, answer due 7/11/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Jon Cieslak, attorney for Estate of Gilbert Penhollow. (Combs, Tracy)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: granting #7 Non-Resident Attorney Casey R. Fronk's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission, designating Charles E. Canter as local counsel. (hr)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Casey R. Fronk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #7 filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Canter, Charles)
May 10, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Casey R. Fronk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. Other error(s) with document(s): Line for address and phone numbers are difficult to read on application. (lt)
May 9, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Casey R. Fronk to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for US Government Attorney) filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order G-64 Pro Hac Vice) (Canter, Charles)
May 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Casey R. Fronk. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Agravitae Inc., Reynaldo Aguilar, Jr, James Brian Blaylock, Ross Gregory Erskine, Freelife Logistics LLC, Kenneth Dewayne Owen, Personal Group LLC, Signature One Capital Inc., Storber LLC, TKO Farms Inc., and The Estate of Gilbert Allan Penhollow. (jtil)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
May 6, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Combs, Tracy)
May 6, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Combs, Tracy)
May 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attorney Tracy Schloss Combs added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla))(Combs, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. TKO Farms Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Tracy Schloss Combs
Represented By: Charles E. Canter
Represented By: Casey R. Fronk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TKO Farms Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agravitae Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Dewayne Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reynaldo Aguilar, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brian Blaylock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Gregory Erskine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Gilbert Allan Penhollow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freelife Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Personal Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Signature One Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storber LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?