Manal Madani et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Manal Madani, Ali Alroalle and Yazeed Alroalle
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, Los Angeles Asylum Office, David Radel, ALEJANDRO J. MAYORKAS, UR M JADDOU, Ted H. Kim, MATTHEW D EMRICH, Christopher A. Wray, Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur M. Jaddou and Matthew D. Emrich
Case Number: 8:2022cv01150
Filed: June 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 28, 2022 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant David Radel served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 28, 2022 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 28, 2022 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 28, 2022 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant Ted H. Kim served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 28, 2022 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 28, 2022 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant Matthew D. Emrich served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 28, 2022 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani, upon Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security served on 6/27/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
June 14, 2022 Filing 23 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Christopher A. Wray. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 22 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 21 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant David Radel. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 20 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Asylum Office. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 19 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alejandro Mayorkas. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ted H. Kim. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 17 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Ur M. Jaddou. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 16 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Matthew D. Emrich. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 15 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States Department of Homeland Security. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car)
June 13, 2022 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani, (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Ali Alroalle, Yazeed Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Jubran, Lewis)
June 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33460729 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Yazeed Alroalle, Ali Alroalle, Manal Madani. (Attorney Lewis Jubran added to party Ali Alroalle(pty:pla), Attorney Lewis Jubran added to party Yazeed Alroalle(pty:pla), Attorney Lewis Jubran added to party Manal Madani(pty:pla))(Jubran, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manal Madani et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manal Madani
Represented By: Lewis Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Alroalle
Represented By: Lewis Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yazeed Alroalle
Represented By: Lewis Jubran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Asylum Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Radel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO J. MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UR M JADDOU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted H. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW D EMRICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur M. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Emrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?