Ronald Rene Ceballos et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Rene Ceballos and Guadalupe Maria Ceballos
Defendant: FCA US LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv01226
Filed: June 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: John W Holcomb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2023 Filing 43 JUDGMENT by Judge John W. Holcomb, in favor of Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos against FCA US LLC. The Court hereby enters JUDGMENT in FAVOR of Plaintiffs, and AGAINST Defendant, in the amount of $90,000.00 for Damages and $30,000.00 for Attorneys fees and costs pursuant to the terms of the Rule 68 Offer. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (yl)
June 23, 2023 Filing 42 REQUEST to Enforce Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 68(a) filed by plaintiff Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Judgment) (Dolin, Tionna)
June 23, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Settlement JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT filed by plaintiff Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. (LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 23, 2023 Filing 40 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque counsel for Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. Adding Elizabeth Larocque as counsel of record for Ronald R. Ceballos and Guadalupe M. Ceballos for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Ronald R. Ceballos and Guadalupe M. Ceballos. (Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Guadalupe Maria Ceballos(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth A LaRocque added to party Ronald Rene Ceballos(pty:pla))(LaRocque, Elizabeth)
June 12, 2023 Filing 39 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi counsel for Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. Adding Rabiya Tirmizi as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald Rene Ceballos and Guadalupe Maria Ceballos. (Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Guadalupe Maria Ceballos(pty:pla), Attorney Rabiya F. Tirmizi added to party Ronald Rene Ceballos(pty:pla))(Tirmizi, Rabiya)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS [ECF No. #28 ] by Judge John W. Holcomb. For the foregoing reasons, the Court hereby ORDERS that FCA's instant Rule 12(c) Motion is DENIED. (See document for further details) (yl)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES by Judge John W. Holcomb. (yl) Modified on 4/21/2023
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court finds that the Defendants Motion to For Judgment [ECF No. 28] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the hearing set on April 21, 2023. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 17, 2023 Filing 35 First STIPULATION to Continue Trial and Related Dates from Currently Set to 120 days later or as ordered by the Court filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Ariel Harman-Holmes, #2 Proposed Order)(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 4, 2023 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Jeanette Catuira Suarez added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Suarez, Jeanette)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: On its own motion, the Court CONTINUES the Defendant's Motion for Judgment [ECF No. 28] from April 14, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. to April 21, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. The parties are DIRECTED to appear in person in Courtroom 9D, on the 9th Floor of the Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 411 W. Fourth Street Santa Ana, CA 92701. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 31, 2023 Filing 32 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #28 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
March 24, 2023 Filing 31 OPPOSITION to MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; FRCP 12(c) re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings #28 filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. (Law, Daniel)
March 24, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Law counsel for Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. Adding Daniel Law as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald Rene Ceballos and Guadalupe Maria Ceballos. (Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Guadalupe Maria Ceballos(pty:pla), Attorney Daniel A Law added to party Ronald Rene Ceballos(pty:pla))(Law, Daniel)
March 23, 2023 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULE 11-6 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
February 27, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to on the Pleadings filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A iso GG's Decl, #4 Exhibit B iso GG's Decl, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service) (Gruzman, Greg)
January 9, 2023 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) Order Denying Stipulation for Protective Order [Dkt. #26 ]. The Proposed Protective Order (Dkt. 26) is DENIED without prejudice to the parties submitting a new stipulation and proposed protective order consistent with the foregoing. The parties are directed to the Procedures and Schedules page of the assigned Magistrate Judge for a copy of a model protective order, which the parties may, but are not required, to use as a model. **See Order for details** (kh)
January 6, 2023 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dolin, Tionna)
December 29, 2022 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nino Sanaia counsel for Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. Adding Nino Sanaia as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald Rene Ceballos and Guadalupe Maria Ceballos. (Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Guadalupe Maria Ceballos(pty:pla), Attorney Nino Sanaia added to party Ronald Rene Ceballos(pty:pla))(Sanaia, Nino)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 3 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 06/16/2023. (cla)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. Discovery cut-off 5/19/2023, Last date to conduct Settlement Conference is 6/16/2023, Dispositive Motions cut-off 7/28/2023, Motions in Limine cut-off 9/1/2023, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2023 at 1:00 PM, Jury Trial set for 9/25/2023 at 9:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
November 18, 2022 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Ronald Rene Ceballos and Guadalupe Maria Ceballos for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald Rene Ceballos and Guadalupe Maria Ceballos. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Guadalupe Maria Ceballos(pty:pla), Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Ronald Rene Ceballos(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on September 23, 2022 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dgo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 12, 2022 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (First Amended) ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 9, 2022 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan (Plaintiffs' Position) ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiffs Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, Ronald Rene Ceballos.. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (dgo)
July 29, 2022 Filing 17 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gruzman, Greg)
July 29, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying FCA US LLC, FCA North America Holdings LLC, FCA Holdco B.V., Stellantis N.V. (formerly known as FIat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
July 29, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azemoon, Ali)
July 29, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ali Azemoon on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Ali Azemoon added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Azemoon, Ali)
July 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Greg Gruzman on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Greg Gruzman added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Gruzman, Greg)
July 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Hailey Marie Rogerson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Rogerson, Hailey)
July 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Defendant FCA US LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Spencer Peter Hugret added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hugret, Spencer)
July 14, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ronald Rene Ceballos, Guadalupe Maria Ceballos, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (dgo)
June 28, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (lh)
June 28, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
June 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
June 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh)
June 28, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by plaintiff GUADALUPE MARIA CEBALLOS, RONALD RENE CEBALLOS. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 28, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff GUADALUPE MARIA CEBALLOS, RONALD RENE CEBALLOS, identifying FCA US LLC. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs GUADALUPE MARIA CEBALLOS, RONALD RENE CEBALLOS. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33542267 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff RONALD RENE CEBALLOS, GUADALUPE MARIA CEBALLOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party GUADALUPE MARIA CEBALLOS(pty:pla), Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party RONALD RENE CEBALLOS(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald Rene Ceballos et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Rene Ceballos
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Maria Ceballos
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Nino Sanaia
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Represented By: Daniel A Law
Represented By: Rabiya F. Tirmizi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Ali Azemoon
Represented By: Greg Gruzman
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Jeanette Catuira Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?