Quincy Bioscience, LLC v. Centre Field Retail et al
Plaintiff: QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC
Defendant: CENTRE FIELD RETAIL, WAVEN RETAIL, Alfred Noah Omondi, Jason D, Ross, Jason D. Ross and Does 1 through 5, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv01327
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1121 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Granting #11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Protective Order. See Order for details. (es)
August 14, 2022 Filing 11 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Approving Proposed Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order) (Cole, William)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Granting #2 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING EXPEDITED THIRD-PARTY DISCOVERY. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's Motion and authorizes the issuance of subpoenas to Amazon, PhysicalAddress.com, GoDaddy.com LLC, and Evolve Bank & Trust, seeking the items described in Attachment A to the Motion. (es)
July 19, 2022 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Quincy Bioscience, LLC. (Orr, Matthew)
July 19, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment(s): # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice of Interested Parties, # 3 Summons (Ross), # 4 Summons (Waven), # 5 Summons (Centre), # 6 Summons (Omondi) not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. The document(s) should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs.. (sh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Centre Field Retail, Alfred Noah Omondi, Jason D. Ross, Waven Retail. (Attachments: #1 Waven Retail, #2 Centre Field Retail, #3 Alfred Noah Omondi) (sh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: #1 AO-120) (sh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (sh)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Third Party Discovery filed by Plaintiff QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Schmidt, #2 Declaration of W. Cole, #3 Proposed Order) (Cole, William)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33650202 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Summons (Ross), #4 Summons (Waven), #5 Summons (Centre), #6 Summons (Omondi)) (Attorney William P Cole added to party QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC(pty:pla))(Cole, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quincy Bioscience, LLC v. Centre Field Retail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUINCY BIOSCIENCE, LLC
Represented By: William P Cole
Represented By: Matthew R. Orr
Represented By: Richard L. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTRE FIELD RETAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAVEN RETAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Noah Omondi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D, Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason D. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 5, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?