Ladan Sadeghi v. Chip Laitinen et al
Plaintiff: Ladan Sadeghi
Defendant: Chip Laitinen and Antony Blinken
Case Number: 8:2022cv01334
Filed: July 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Antony Blinken, Chip Laitinen.(Attorney Jasmin Yang added to party Antony Blinken(pty:dft), Attorney Jasmin Yang added to party Chip Laitinen(pty:dft))(Yang, Jasmin)
August 9, 2022 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER. (kdu)
August 5, 2022 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ladan Sadeghi, upon Defendant Antony Blinken served on 8/3/2022, answer due 10/3/2022; Chip Laitinen served on 8/3/2022, answer due 10/3/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Richard "Doe". Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to MERRICK GARLAND. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Goldstein, Joshua)
August 2, 2022 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ladan Sadeghi, upon Defendant Chip Laitinen served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to STEPHANIE S. CHRJSTENSEN U.S. ATTORNEY. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to MERRICK GARLAND U.S Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Goldstein, Joshua)
August 2, 2022 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ladan Sadeghi, upon Defendant Antony Blinken served on 7/25/2022, answer due 9/23/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to STEPHANIE S. CHRJSTENSEN U.S. ATTORNEY. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to MERRICK GARLAND U.S Attorney General. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by unspecified means. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. (Goldstein, Joshua)
July 19, 2022 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Antony Blinken, Chip Laitinen. (et)
July 19, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
July 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
July 19, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ladan Sadeghi. (Goldstein, Joshua)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ladan Sadeghi, (Goldstein, Joshua)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ladan Sadeghi. (Goldstein, Joshua)
July 19, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Mandamus and Complaint for Injunctive Relief Receipt No: ACACDC-33655463 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Ladan Sadeghi. (Attorney Joshua L. Goldstein added to party Ladan Sadeghi(pty:pla))(Goldstein, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ladan Sadeghi v. Chip Laitinen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladan Sadeghi
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip Laitinen
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Jasmin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Jasmin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?