Jose Lagunas v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jose Lagunas
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv01660
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John D Early
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court, Central Justice Center #19 filed by Plaintiff Jose Lagunas. (Dillavou, Nicolas)
October 27, 2022 Filing 20 OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court, Central Justice Center #19 filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sasha Bassi in Support of MBUSA's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Sasha Bassi, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Sasha Bassi)(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
October 7, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court, Central Justice Center filed by Plaintiff Jose Lagunas. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dillavou, Nicolas)
October 6, 2022 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nicolas M Dillavou counsel for Plaintiff Jose Lagunas. Jon P. Jacobs is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jose Lagunas. (Dillavou, Nicolas)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2022 at 9:00 a.m. See Order for details. The Order to Show Cause is hereby discharged. (mku)
October 3, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 10/7/2022, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further information). (jp)
September 23, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Lagunas, (Dillavou, Nicolas)
September 23, 2022 Filing 13 Notice Stip to dismiss 5th Cause of Action ONLY filed by Plaintiff and Defendant Jose Lagunas. (Dillavou, Nicolas)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
September 23, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge John D. Early. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8:22-cv-01660 FWS(JDEx). (rn)
September 22, 2022 Filing 10 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Dillavou, Nicolas)
September 22, 2022 Filing 9 DEMAND for Jury Trial Jose Lagunas.. (Dillavou, Nicolas)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #6 , by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to September 26, 2022. (es)
September 15, 2022 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Sasha Bassi filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 15, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
September 8, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC., filed by Plaintiff Jose Lagunas. (FILED IN ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/5/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
September 8, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC, identifying Daimler North America Corporation. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 8, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC identifying Daimler North America Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Tahsildoost, Soheyl)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01273686 Receipt No: ACACDC-33952130 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Soheyl Tahsildoost added to party Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC(pty:dft))(Tahsildoost, Soheyl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Lagunas v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lagunas
Represented By: Nicolas M Dillavou
Represented By: Jon P Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Soheyl Tahsildoost
Represented By: Sasha Bassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?