Waneta M. Kelsey v. Manorcare of Fountain Valley CA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Waneta M. Kelsey
Defendant: Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC dba ManorCare Health Services doing business as ManorCare Health Services Erroneously Sued As Manorcare of Fountain Valey CA, LLC doing business as Manocare Health Services F, Does 1 through 200, inclusive, Manorcare of Fountain Valley CA, LLC doing business as Manocare Health Services Fountain Valley and Manorcare of Palm Desert CA, LLC doing business as Manorcare Health Services Fountain Valley
Case Number: 8:2022cv01782
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff Waneta M. Kelsey(Peck, Adam)
November 7, 2022 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly Arouh counsel for Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. Stephanie M. Atkinson is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Arouh, Kimberly)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to File Amended Complaint #10 , #11 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter, the following: Plaintiff, pursuant to FRCP 15(a)(2), shall file a first amended complaint on or before 11/14/2022. (jp)
October 25, 2022 Filing 11 Corrected STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bootier, Michael)
October 24, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bootier, Michael)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC answer now due 10/26/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Atkinson, Stephanie)
October 3, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 served on 9/29/2022. (Atkinson, Stephanie)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
September 29, 2022 Filing 6 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
September 28, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 200, inclusive, Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Waneta M. Kelsey. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/28/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A PAGE 10) (ghap) Modified on 9/29/2022 (ghap).
September 28, 2022 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Waneta M. Kelsey, upon Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC served on 8/29/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum/Agent For Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/2/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B PAGE 38) (ghap)
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC, identifying HCR IV Healthcare, LLC; ProMedica Health System, Inc.; and ProMedica Indemnity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Atkinson, Stephanie)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. (Atkinson, Stephanie)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2022-01272243-CU-NP-CJC Receipt No: ACACDC-34067733 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Stephanie M. Atkinson added to party Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC(pty:dft))(Atkinson, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waneta M. Kelsey v. Manorcare of Fountain Valley CA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waneta M. Kelsey
Represented By: Adam Joshua Peck
Represented By: Steven Charles Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC Manor Care of Fountain Valley CA, LLC dba ManorCare Health Services doing business as ManorCare Health Services Erroneously Sued As Manorcare of Fountain Valey CA, LLC doing business as Manocare Health Services F
Represented By: Stephanie M. Atkinson
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh
Represented By: Michael W Bootier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 200, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manorcare of Fountain Valley CA, LLC doing business as Manocare Health Services Fountain Valley
Represented By: Kimberly Arouh
Represented By: Michael W Bootier
Represented By: Stephanie M. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manorcare of Palm Desert CA, LLC doing business as Manorcare Health Services Fountain Valley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?