Orange County Coastkeeper v. Bodycote Thermal Processing Inc.
Plaintiff: Orange County Coastkeeper
Defendant: BODYCOTE THERMAL PROCESSING INC. and Bodycote Thermal Processing, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv02040
Filed: November 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Fred W Slaughter
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Conduct Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper.(Davis, Rebecca)
December 15, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. upon Bodycote Thermal Processing, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/8/2022, answer due 2/6/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Eddie A Jauregui. (Davis, Rebecca)
December 2, 2022 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rebecca Leah Davis counsel for Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. Michael Lozeau is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Davis, Rebecca)
December 2, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rebecca Leah Davis counsel for Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. Armita Ariano is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Davis, Rebecca)
November 30, 2022 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rebecca Leah Davis counsel for Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. Adding Rebecca Davis as counsel of record for Orange County Coastkeeper for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attorney Rebecca Leah Davis added to party Orange County Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Davis, Rebecca)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
November 9, 2022 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Bodycote Thermal Processing, Inc. (lh)
November 9, 2022 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
November 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 9, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
November 8, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Flynn, Brian)
November 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper, (Flynn, Brian)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Attorney Information Attachment)(Flynn, Brian)
November 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34289666 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Orange County Coastkeeper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 60 Day Notice of Intent) (Attorney Brian Bamford Flynn added to party Orange County Coastkeeper(pty:pla))(Flynn, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orange County Coastkeeper v. Bodycote Thermal Processing Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orange County Coastkeeper
Represented By: Brian Bamford Flynn
Represented By: Rebecca Leah Davis
Represented By: Armita Amanda Ariano
Represented By: Douglas Jonathan Chermak
Represented By: Michael R Lozeau
Represented By: Sarah J Spinuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BODYCOTE THERMAL PROCESSING INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bodycote Thermal Processing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?