Arthur Keller et al v. James R. Ling et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Keller and Louisa Taadou
Defendant: James R. Ling, Etereo Spirits, LLC (CA), Etereo Lifestyle, LLC, Etereo Tequila, LLC, Etereo Spirits, LLC and DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Case Number: 8:2022cv02142
Filed: November 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/24/2023. (twdb)
January 17, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #12 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #13 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #14 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
January 13, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou, upon Defendant Etereo Tequila, LLC served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "John Doe" Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Carreon, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou, upon Defendant Etereo Spirits, LLC served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "John Doe" Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Carreon, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou, upon Defendant Etereo Lifestyle, LLC served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "John Doe" Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Carreon, Ryan)
January 13, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou, upon Defendant James R. Ling served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "John Doe" Office Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Carreon, Ryan)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Etereo Lifestyle, LLC, Etereo Spirits, LLC, Etereo Tequila, LLC, James R. Ling. (Attachments: #1 Etereo Spirits, #2 Etereo Teq, #3 JRLing) (jtil)
November 30, 2022 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
November 28, 2022 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou. (Carreon, Ryan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou. (Carreon, Ryan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou. (Carreon, Ryan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou. (Carreon, Ryan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou. (Carreon, Ryan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34386654 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Arthur Keller, Louisa Taadou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-D) (Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Arthur Keller(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan E Carreon added to party Louisa Taadou(pty:pla))(Carreon, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arthur Keller et al v. James R. Ling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Keller
Represented By: Ryan E Carreon
Represented By: Mathew K Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisa Taadou
Represented By: Ryan E Carreon
Represented By: Mathew K Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Ling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etereo Spirits, LLC (CA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etereo Lifestyle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etereo Tequila, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etereo Spirits, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?