EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Kodella LLC
Plaintiff: EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Defendant: Kodella LLC
Case Number: 8:2023cv00660
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John W Holcomb
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2023 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Abby Washburn at abby@bochner.law with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reinitz, Ariel)
October 5, 2023 Filing 38 STIPULATION to Continue hearing on Defendants Motion (Dkt. 37) from October 27, 2023 to November 3, 2023 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #37 filed by plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reinitz, Ariel)
September 22, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by defendant Kodella LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
September 1, 2023 Filing 36 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Redline version of First Amended Complaint (Dkt. 35), showing changes against Complaint (Dkt. 1) as to Amended Complaint/Petition #35 . (Reinitz, Ariel)
September 1, 2023 Filing 35 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Kodella LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #19 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC(Reinitz, Ariel)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation [ECF No. 33], and it is hereby APPROVED. (1) Plaintiff's deadline to file its amended complaint is EXTENDED to September 1, 2023; and (2) Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint is EXTENDED to September 22, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 25, 2023 Filing 33 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reinitz, Ariel)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: The Court has reviewed the parties' Stipulation [ECF No. 31], and it is hereby APPROVED. (1) Plaintiff's deadline to file its amended complaint is EXTENDED to August 25, 2023; and (2) Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's amended complaint is EXTENDED to September 15, 2023.IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cla) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 16, 2023 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reinitz, Ariel)
July 21, 2023 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AMENDED filed by Defendant Kodella LLC identifying N/A as Corporate Parent. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. Discovery cut-off 3/8/2024. Motions due by 5/17/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/5/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2024 01:00 PM before Judge John W. Holcomb. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. Motion set for hearing on 6/21/2024 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm)
July 14, 2023 Filing 28 MINUTES OF HEARING RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS CASE #21 ; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John W. Holcomb. The Court confers with counsel and hears oral argument. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Case [ECF No. 21] is DENIED without prejudice. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint no later than August 18, 2023. Defendant is DIRECTED to file its response to Plaintiff's amended complaint no later than September 8, 2023. The parties are DIRECTED to meet and confer thoroughly regarding the failure-to-state-a-claim issues that the Defendant has raised. Defendant is DIRECTED to file an amended Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement no later than July 21, 2023. Court Reporter: Deborah Parker. (rolm)
June 30, 2023 Filing 27 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Defendant Kodella LLC. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
June 30, 2023 Filing 26 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-5 days, filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC.. (Reinitz, Ariel)
June 23, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #21 filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reinitz, Ariel)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2023 at 9:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
June 9, 2023 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Kodella LLC, identifying KODELLA LLC; EMES2 PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC. (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
June 9, 2023 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Kodella LLC (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
June 9, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Kodella LLC. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tabibkhoei, Farah)
May 15, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error. Text entry was not served on the parties re 14 (ev)
May 12, 2023 Filing 19 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 04/17/2023, receipt number 35147588), filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Ayres, Jacob)
May 10, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The complaint was filed as a scanned copy, not a word-searchable PDF document. Failure to comply with L.R. 5-4.3.1 prohibits the filing of PDF images created by scanning paper documents. Filed PDFs must be in a word-searchable format. (et)
May 9, 2023 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kodella LLC answer now due 6/9/2023, filed by defendant Kodella LLC.(Attorney Farah Tabibkhoei added to party Kodella LLC(pty:dft))(Tabibkhoei, Farah)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Text Only ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ariel Reinitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC #12 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 2, 2023 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC, upon Defendant Kodella LLC served on 4/19/2023, answer due 5/10/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bridgette Nelson - Administration for Eric Bibi; Agent Designated for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Ayres, Jacob)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Text Only ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ariel Reinitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC #12 by Judge John W. Holcomb. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ev) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 21, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ariel Reinitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/17/2023, Receipt No. 35147820) #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 4/18/20, Dkt. 6. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt)
April 20, 2023 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ariel Reinitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/17/2023, Receipt No. 35147820) filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Ayres, Jacob)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (ev)
April 18, 2023 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kodella LLC. (et)
April 18, 2023 Filing 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
April 18, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 18, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (et)
April 17, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ariel Reinitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35147820) #5 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
April 17, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ariel Reinitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35147820) filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Ayres, Jacob)
April 17, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Ayres, Jacob)
April 17, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Ayres, Jacob)
April 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Ayres, Jacob)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-35147588 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Attorney Jacob Ayres added to party EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC(pty:pla))(Ayres, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC v. Kodella LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMES2 Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Ayres
Represented By: Ariel Reinitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kodella LLC
Represented By: Farah Tabibkhoei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?