Total Vision, LLC et al v. Vision Service Plan et al
Plaintiff: TOTAL VISION, LLC, TOTAL VISION, P.C. and Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
Defendant: VISION SERVICE PLAN a/k/a VSP GLOBAL, VISIONWORKS OF AMERICA, INC., VSP VENTURES MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, ALTAIR EYEWEAR, INC., EYEFINITY, INC., MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC., PLEXUS OPTIX, INC., VSP LABS, INC., EYECONIC, INC., Vision Service Plan and VSP Global
Interested Party: TOTAL VISION INTERCO,LLC and Erwin M. Omens
Case Number: 8:2023cv01805
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Total Vision, P.C., Total Vision, LLC. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Laura A. Brenner. (Wolfson, Adam)
September 29, 2023 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Altair Eyewear, Inc., Eyeconic, Inc., Eyefinity, Inc., Marchon Eyewear, Inc., Plexus Optix, Inc., VSP Labs, Inc., VSP Ventures Management Services, LLC, Vision Service Plan, Visionworks of America, Inc. (et)
September 29, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
September 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (et)
September 26, 2023 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Wolfson, Adam)
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, identifying Total Vision Interco, LLC and Erwin M. Omens. (Wolfson, Adam)
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Wolfson, Adam)
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 09/26/2023, receipt number 36113064), filed by Plaintiffs Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Attorney Adam B. Wolfson added to party Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP(pty:pla))(Wolfson, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Vision, LLC et al v. Vision Service Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOTAL VISION, LLC
Represented By: Adam B. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOTAL VISION, P.C.
Represented By: Adam B. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
Represented By: Adam B. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISION SERVICE PLAN a/k/a VSP GLOBAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISIONWORKS OF AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSP VENTURES MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTAIR EYEWEAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYEFINITY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARCHON EYEWEAR, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLEXUS OPTIX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSP LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EYECONIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vision Service Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSP Global
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TOTAL VISION INTERCO,LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Erwin M. Omens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?