Westchester Fire Insurance Company v. The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange
Plaintiff: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 8:2024cv01539
Filed: July 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE #21 by Judge Percy Anderson. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange, designating Ronald A. Valenzuela as local counsel. Granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Alexander T. Brown (rolm)
August 28, 2024 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alexander T. Brown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38109684) filed by Attorney The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (IL), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (MO), #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Valenzuela, Ronald)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson. APPLICATION of Attorney Brenton W. Vincent to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange, designating Ronald A. Valenzuela as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Brenton W. Vincent. (aco)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Percy Anderson. APPLICATION of Attorney Caitlin M. Albaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange, designating Ronald A. Valenzuela as local counsel is GRANTED.; granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin M. Albaugh. (aco)
August 23, 2024 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin M. Albaugh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38083388) filed by Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Valenzuela, Ronald)
August 23, 2024 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brenton W. Vincent to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38083126) filed by Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Valenzuela, Ronald)
August 14, 2024 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange answer now due 9/26/2024, filed by Defendants The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange.(Attorney Ronald A. Valenzuela added to party The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange(pty:dft))(Valenzuela, Ronald)
August 1, 2024 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company, upon Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange served on 7/26/2024, answer due 8/16/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Potente, Alexander)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
July 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge James V. Selna. Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 8:24-cv-01539-PA-(DFMx). (dve)
July 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL #4 by Judge James V. Selna: It is therefore ORDERED that: 1. The designated portions of Westchester's Complaint shall be filed under seal. 2. The redacted version of Westchester's Complaint shall be the only version available to the public. (es)
July 12, 2024 Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp)
July 12, 2024 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange. (lh)
July 12, 2024 Filing 9 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
July 12, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 12, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh)
July 12, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company, identifying Chubb US Holdings Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Chubb Limited. (Chorley, Jason)
July 11, 2024 Filing 5 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document Complaint under seal #4 filed by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Protective Order, #2 Unredacted Document - Complaint)(Chorley, Jason)
July 11, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to file document Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document - Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Jason J Chorley added to party Westchester Fire Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Chorley, Jason)
July 11, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Potente, Alexander)
July 11, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Potente, Alexander)
July 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37816716 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Attorney Alexander Eugene Potente added to party Westchester Fire Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Potente, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westchester Fire Insurance Company v. The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Bishop of Orange
Represented By: Ronald A. Valenzuela
Represented By: Caitlin M. Albaugh
Represented By: Brenton W. Vincent
Represented By: Alexander T. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason J Chorley
Represented By: Zoheb Noorani
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Represented By: Jessica Snyder
Represented By: Alexander Eugene Potente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?